Johnson v. ECI Two Arden, LLC
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Defendant: ECI Two Arden, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00779
Filed: March 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND DISPOSITION signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/25/2011 ORDERING dispositional documents to be filed on or before 9/26/2011. All dates are vacated. (Krueger, M)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 7/27/11 ORDERING that Defendant ECI Two Arden, LLC shall have until 8/23/2011 to respond to the Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 6/8/11 ORDERING dft ECI Two Arden, LLC shall have until 7/22/11 to respond to complaint. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. ECI Two Arden, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott N. Johnson
Represented By: Scott N. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECI Two Arden, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?