Arrow Electronics, Inc. v. Logical Design, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arrow Electronics, Inc. and Arrow Enterprise Computing Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Logical Design, Inc. and Steven Vettel
Case Number: 2:2011cv00845
Filed: March 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE and entering judgment signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/11/15. Judgment is entered against Defendant Logical Design, Inc. in the amount of $456,145.24. Defendant Stephen Vettel is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/10/14 ORDERING the Bench Trial RESET for 5/11/15 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7; The parties shall file trial briefs not later than 3/5/15; Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 3/19/15 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7; The Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due not later than 2/26/15; Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 2/26/15. Oppositions must be filed by 3/5/15 and any reply must be filed by 3/12/15. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference; Due to the Court's high civil caseload, the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to a jury or nonjury trial before the assigned Magistrate Judge as well as availing themselves of the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution programs. Accordingly, the parties' Joint Stipulation and Request to Modify Dates in Court's Order Continuing Trial (ECF No. 23 ) is denied as moot. (Becknal, R)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/4/14 ORDERING that the Bench Trial is CONTINUED to 1/26/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., with trial briefs due not later than 11/20/2014. The Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 12/4/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., with joint final pretrial statement due not later than 11/15/2014. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by 11/15/2014, oppositions due by 11/20/2014, and any reply due by 11/26/2014. The motions will be heard by the Court at the same time as the Final Pretrial Conference. (Kastilahn, A)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/29/2012 ORDERING Bench Trial Reset for 3/3/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Trial Briefs due by 12/26/2013; Final Pretrial Conference Res et for 1/9/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr.; Joint Pretrial Statement due by 12/19/2013; Evidentiary or Procedural Motions filed by 12/19/2013; Oppositions due by 12/26/2013, and Replies due by 1/2/2014. (Reader, L)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/17/11: All discovery shall be completed BY 8/3/2012. Designation of Expert Witnesses is due BY 10/3/2012. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall BE 2/7/2013. Th e Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 4/4/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. The parties' joint final pretrial conference statement shall be filed BY 3/14/2013. The parties shall FILE trial briefs not l ater than 3/21/2013. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed BY 3/14/2013, oppositions must be filed BY 3/21/2013, and any reply must be filed BY 3/28/2013. A Jury Trial is SET for 6/3/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and is estimated to last five days. (Kastilahn, A)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEUDLING ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/7/11. All discovery shall be completed BY 8/3/2012. Designation of Expert Witnesses is due BY 10/3/2012. The last day to hear dispositive motions shall BE 2/7/2013. The Final P retrial Conference is SET for 4/4/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. The parties' joint final pretrial conference statement shall be filed BY 3/14/2013. The parties shall FILE trial briefs not later than 3/21/2013. Any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed BY 3/14/2013, oppositions must be filed BY 3/21/2013, and any reply must be filed BY 3/28/2013. A Jury Trial is SET for 6/3/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arrow Electronics, Inc. v. Logical Design, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Galen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrow Enterprise Computing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Galen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logical Design, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph William Scalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Vettel
Represented By: John Claire Lassner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?