Kirby v. Lewis
Petitioner: Rudy Grant Kirby
Respondent: Greg Lewis
Case Number: 2:2011cv00962
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/22/11 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/2/11 ORDERING that respondent shall notify this court, within 10 days, of any objection to the voluntary dismissal of this action.(Dillon, M)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/2011 ORDERING that ptnr's 15 renewed motion for a stay and abeyance is DENIED as moot ; w/in 30 days, respondent shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to ptnr's 18 second renewed motion for stay and abeyance; and ptnr's reply, if any, due w/in 14 days of respondent's opposition. (Yin, K)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/23/11 ORDERING that petitioners 13 motion for a stay and abeyance is DENIED as moot; Within 30 days of the date of this order, petitioner shall file a second amended petition that contains all of his exhausted and unexhausted claims; Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner the form for habeas corpus application.(Dillon, M)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/07/11 ordering within 30 days of the date of service of this order, petitioner shall either: (a) file a declaration indicating he wishes to proceed under the Kelly procedure, or (b) file an amended petition that contains all of his exhausted and unexhausted claims, together with a renewed motion for a stay and abeyance with sufficient facts and information to satisfy the requirements of Rhines. Respondent is relieved of having to file a response to petitioner's original petition for writ of habeas corpus. The clerk of the court is directed to send petitioner the court's form for filing a petition for writ of habeas corpus. (Plummer, M)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/16/11 ORDERING that the 11 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; respondent shall have until 07/20/11 to file a responsive pleading. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rudy Grant Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Lewis
Represented By: Tia Marie Coronado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?