Rohlfing v. Sokol
Plaintiff: Kristi Rohlfing
Defendant: F Don Sokol
Case Number: 2:2011cv01042
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/19/11 ORDERING that the substitution of counsel 11 is APPROVED. The deadline for plaintiff to file an amended complaint is CONTINUED to 11/11/2011. The referral of this case to the magistrate judge is withdrawn and the case is referred back to the district judge. (Kastilahn, A)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/30/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's request for reconsideration of the 8/1/11 order denying her request for appointment of counsel is denied; Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file an amended complaint 9 is granted; Plaintiff has until 10/17/11 to file an amended complaint, as provided in the 7/27/11 order. (Becknal, R)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/1/11 DENYING 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Donati, J)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/27/2011 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DENYING as moot 3 Motion to Add "Doe" Defendants; DENYING without prejudice 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel; DENYING 5 Motion for Remand of Cases. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days to file an amended complaint. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohlfing v. Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Don Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?