Armstead v. Virga et al
Plaintiff: James Armstead
Defendant: Tim V. Virga, V Mini, C. Cannedy and K. A. Daly
Case Number: 2:2011cv01054
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/31/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's in forma status 2 is REVOKED; The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/25/13 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/2013 VACATING the 82 findings and recommendations; plaintiff has 30 days to file either an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment or a motion for law library access. (Yin, K)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/20/2013 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/16/13 ordering that within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings. (Plummer, M)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/4/13 ORDERING that plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file his appeal is granted; plaintiffs notice of appeal (Dkt. No. 71 ) is deemed timely; and the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order on the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc Ninth Circuit)(Dillon, M)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/4/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 1/10/13 REQUEST for Reconsideration 70 is DENIED; Plaintiff's 1/10/13 REQUEST for STAY of this action is GRANTED; This Action is STAYED for a period of four months; within four months from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file a status report. The 1/09/13 Discovery and Scheduling Order 69 is VACATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/6/2012 ORDERING that the 60 Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in full. Plaintiff's 58 , 63 motion for injunctive relief is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/29/2012 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 51 are ADOPTED in FULL; Defendant's 29 motion to dismiss is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART; plaintiff is GRANTED 14 days to file an amended complaint in accordance with the 7/3/2012 F & R's.(Reader, L)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/17/12 recommending that 58 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER be denied. F&R referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections to F&R due within twenty one days. (Kaminski, H)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/11/12 ORDERING that upon reconsideration, the Order of the Magistrate Judge filed 7/19/12 is AFFIRMED; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and objections to the 7/3/12 Findings and Recommendations are due within thirty days of the date of this order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/18/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motions for injunctive relief 49 , 50 , construed as motions for protective orders, are DENIED; Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time 52 is GRANTED; plaintiffs amended complaint and objections to the findings and recommendations are due within 30 days. (Dillon, M)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/2/2012 ORDERING that defendants' 29 motion to dismiss is GRANTED with leave for plaintiff to amend, as to the claims stated in this order; plaintiff' s second amended complaint is due within 14 days of an order adopting these findings and recommendations; defendants' response due within 21 days of the filing of the second amended complaint; and RECOMMENDING that defendants' 29 motion t o dismiss be granted as to some claims and denied as to other claims, as referenced in these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 21 days. (See Order, Findings and Recommendations for details) (Yin, K)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/10/2012 ORDERING that the 32 findings and recommendations are DISMISSED; plaintiff has 21 days to file an opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. (Yin, K)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/20/2012 VACATING 34 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, 35 Judgment; GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension of Time. Objections to 32 Findings and Recommendations due within 30 days. (Michel, G)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/20/12 recommending that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). MOTION to DISMISS 29 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/07/11 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to defendants' motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/28/2011 ORDERING that within 14 days, Pltf shall SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to file an amended complaint; failure to respond to this order will result in the dismissal of this action. (Zignago, K.)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of James Armstead signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/2011. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstead v. Virga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim V. Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Mini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cannedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. A. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Armstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?