Delgado et al v. National City Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Jose Cruzberto Delgado and Maria De La Luz Delgado
Defendant: National City Mortgage, National City Bank, PNC Bank, N.A. and Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01258
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER igned by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 01/26/12 ORDERING that since PNC has failed to sustain its burden of showing the existence of federal question or diversity removal jurisdiction, this case is REMANDED to the Superior Court of the County of San Joaquin from which it was removed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/19/12 ORDERING plaintiffs to file either whatever documents are required to prosecute this case as a default matter or show cause in a filing why def endant Green Tree Servicing, LLC, should not be dismissed for failure ot prosecution. Status Conference CONTINUED to 4/23/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Plaintiffs have not justified Doe defendants remaining in this action, Does 1-100 are DISMISSED. (Meuleman, A)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE) signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 9/27/11: The Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is CONTINUED to 1/30/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. A further joint status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior. (Kastilahn, A)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/25/11: Plaintiff and Defendants National City Mortgage, National City Bank, and PNC Bank, N.A., are Ordered to Show Cause in a writing to be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. on September 6, 2011, why sanctions should not be imposed against them and/or their counsels for failure to file a timely status report. Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/3/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado et al v. National City Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Cruzberto Delgado
Represented By: Stevan John Henrioulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De La Luz Delgado
Represented By: Stevan John Henrioulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Mortgage
Represented By: Natilee Stitt Riedman
Represented By: Alice M. Dostalova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Bank
Represented By: Alice M. Dostalova
Represented By: Natilee Stitt Riedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alice M. Dostalova
Represented By: Natilee Stitt Riedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?