Mason v. Mercy Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Lewis Mason
Defendant: Peter Brindley, Levi Solada, Mercy Medical Center, Trish Patterson, Elizabeth Hernandez, Teresa Souza, Pete Hansen and City of Redding
Case Number: 2:2011cv01309
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/28/14 granting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/2/13 denying 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 30 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Dillon, M)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/08/12 ordering plaintiff shall file a proposed second amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/25/12 ordering the clerk of the court shall update the docket to reflect that Pete Hansen is no longer a defendant in this action. Defendants Mercy Medical Center, City of Redding, Patterson, Hernandez and Souza are dismissed with prejudice. This action is dismissed in its entirety as to the remaining defendants without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/14/2011 DENYING plaintiff's 15 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/14/2011 DENYING, as unnecessary, plaintiff's 14 motion for leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/29/11 granting 12 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/12/11 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request for the Appointment of Counsel 10 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/19/11 ORDERING that plaintiffs complaint is dismissed with leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Dillon, M)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/28/11 ORDERING the Shasta County Sheriff's Department to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Joshua Lewis Mason to the clerk until the ba lance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Shasta County Sheriff's Department. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/29/11 ORDERING for Plaintiff to submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and FURTHER ORDERING the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Mercy Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Brindley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi Solada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lewis Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?