Biscotti et al v. City of Yuba et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Biscotti and Christian Biscotti
Defendant: City of Yuba City, David Krause, David Santanna, Robert D. Landon and - Wolfe
Case Number: 2:2011cv01347
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/23/2017 FINDING that this action is related to the action denominated 2:16-cv-02552 MCE EFB within the meaning of Local Rule 123; REASSIGNING the related case to Judge John A. Mendez for all future proceedings; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustments in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G.)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/29/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File a FAC 51 is DENIED. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' remaining negligence claim and the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/14/13 GRANTING 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary Judgment is granted in favor of all defendants on all causes of action and Judgment is to be entered accordingly. (Meuleman, A)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/20/12. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biscotti et al v. City of Yuba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Biscotti
Represented By: Phillip A. Cooke
Represented By: Milton Charles Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Biscotti
Represented By: Phillip A. Cooke
Represented By: Milton Charles Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Yuba City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Santanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Landon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?