Asgarian v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Plaintiff: Frederick Asgarian
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01382
Filed: May 20, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/17/2012 DENYING the parties' 16 Joint Request to modify the 12 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order. (Michel, G)
March 27, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISPOSAL DOCUMENTS AFTER NOTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/26/12, ORDERING that the dispositional documents disposing of the case be filed no later than 90 days from the effective date of this order. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
June 27, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/27/12: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, it is hereby ORDERED that the instant action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asgarian v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Asgarian
Represented By: Amanda Lee Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Benson Yeager Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.