Mendoza v. The People of the State of California
Petitioner: Carlos Mendoza
Respondent: The People Of The State Of California
Case Number: 2:2011cv01495
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/15/2011 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders; referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell; Objections due within 14 daysafter being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/10/11 GRANTING 9 and 12 Motions to Proceed IFP. (Dillon, M)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 07/21/11 ordering petitioner's amended petition for writ of habeas corpus 8 is dismissed with leave to amend. Petitioner shall file a second amended petition on the form employed by this court and which names the proper respondent and states all claims and requests for relief within 30 days of the date of this order. The clerk of the court is directed to send petitioner the court's form habeas corpus application. (Plummer, M)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/6/2011 ORDERING that ptnr's 1 habeas corpus petition is DISMISSED w/ leave to amend; ptnr to file an amended petition w/in 30 days; and the clerk to send ptnr a habeas corpus application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. The People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The People Of The State Of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?