Friends of the River et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife, Center for Biological Diversity and Friends of the River
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and Robert L. Van Antwerp
Case Number: 2:2011cv01650
Filed: June 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/11/14: This case is dismissed without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION and ORDER 83 signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/15/13 ORDERING that a stay of the deadline to file the administrative record in this case is issued until Department of Justice attorneys are permitted to resume their usual civil litigation functions. (Kastilahn, A)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/11/2013 ORDERING that the defendants produce, by 10/31/2013, a final, complete Administrative Record on a single hard drive, including documents not being withheld as privileged, and a privilege log. (Michel, G)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/15/2013 GRANTING the Stipulation 76 to continue motion hearing. Therefore, the hearing regarding the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel set for 8/21/2013 is CONTINUED to 9/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Streeter, J)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/8/13: Request for a two week extension of time to file the Joint Status Report is granted. (Kaminski, H)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT STATUS REPORT, STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/15/13. (Meuleman, A)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/18/13. Defendants shall produce the administrative record to plaintiff on or before 3/15/13. Additionally, 60 days after the administrative record is filed, the parties shall file a supplemental joint status report with this Court proposing a new briefing schedule. (Becknal, R)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/12. Defendants shall produce the administrative record to Plaintiff on or before 1/25/2013. Additionally, 60 days after the administrative record is filed, the parties shall file a supplemental joint status report with this Court proposing a new briefing schedule. (Kastilahn, A)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/10/2012 VACATING the Briefing Schedule set forth by 61 Minute Order; ORDERING the Defendants to file the Administrative Record in this case, and in case number 2:12-cv-01396-JAM-JFM, by 11/9/2012; ORDERING the parties to file a Supplemental Joint Status Report 60 days after the Administrative Record is filed. (Michel, G)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/6/2012 ORDERING that the Magistrate Judge assignment in the action denominated 2:12-CV-01396 JAM-EFB be reassigned to Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds for all further proceedings. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 12-CV-01396 JAM-JFM. (Zignago, K.)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/27/12 ORDERING the Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Defendants shall file their Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. (Becknal, R)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 01/24/12 ORDERING that plaintiff's 27 Motion to Compel is DENIED; the hearing on the 26 Motion to Dismiss will be held 02/22/12 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/1/11 GRANTING 19 Application, filed by U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Robert L. Van Antwerp; Plaintiffs' response to Federal Defendants' Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and for Extension o f Time shall be due on: September 7, 2011; Federal Defendants' reply in support of their Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and for Extension of Time shall be due on: September 12, 2011; The Court will notify the parties if it needs a hearing on this motion. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of the River et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Lisa Tamara Belenky
Represented By: Jason C. Rylander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Lisa Tamara Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the River
Represented By: Ernest Robert Wright
Represented By: Lisa Tamara Belenky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Van Antwerp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?