March 13, 2015 |
Filing
207
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/13/15 denying 205 Motion for appointment of counsel. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
March 6, 2015 |
Filing
204
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/5/15 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 11/20/14, 179 are ADOPTED in full; Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS 139 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Pettigrew and Vira are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice; All claims against defendants Gayton, Ortega and Coyle based on events prior to 11/20/08 are DISMISSED; and Defendants' MOTION is otherwise DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
November 20, 2014 |
Filing
179
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/2014 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 139 motion to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part, as follows: (a) defendants Pettigrew and Vira be dismissed fr om this action with prejudice; (b) all claims against defendants Gayton, Ortega, and Coyle base on events prior to 11/20/2008 be dismissed; and (c) defendants' motion otherwise be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
September 24, 2014 |
Filing
172
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/24/14 ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, the minute order of the magistrate judge (ECF No. 155) is AFFIRMED. (Kastilahn, A)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing
152
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2014 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 129 are ADOPTED in full; and plaintiff's 128 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (Reader, L)
|
April 28, 2014 |
Filing
142
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/14 DENYING 138 Motion for order re contempt; Plaintiff may only file the following documents: a. One dispositive motion, limited to one memorandum of points and authorities in support o f the motion and one reply to any opposition; b. One opposition to any motion filed by defendants (and clearly titled as such); c. Only one non-dispositive motion pending at any time. Plaintiff is limited to one memorandum of points and authorities in support of the motion and one reply to any opposition; and d. One set of objections to any future findings and recommendations. Failure to comply with this order shall result in improperly filed documents being stricken from the record and may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Dillon, M)
|
March 21, 2014 |
Filing
129
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/20/14 granting 127 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an opposition to the motion to c ompel. No further extension of time will be granted. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 03/17/14 motion for preliminary injunction 128 be denied. MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 128 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections duw tihin 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
January 13, 2014 |
Filing
116
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/10/2014 DENYING 111 Motion for Reconsideration. (Michel, G)
|
December 5, 2013 |
Filing
107
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/05/13 denying 105 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting 106 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 21 days from the date of this order to file a motion to compel. (Plummer, M)
|
October 28, 2013 |
Filing
100
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/28/13 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 96 Motion to Serve a Subpoena Duces Tecum on Salinas Valley State Prison, to plaintiff's right to propound discovery during the period of discovery set in the 81 Revised Scheduling Order; GRANTING 97 Motion to Serve a Subpoena Duces Tecum on California Medical Facility; DENYING AS MOOT 90 Motion for Extension; and GRANTING 99 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order in which to file a motion to compel. (Meuleman, A)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
86
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/6/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 8/29/13 filing 83 is construed as a request for reconsideration of the court's 8/15/2013 orders and, so construed, is DENIED. (Yin, K)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing
80
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/15/13 GRANTING as follows: a. Requests No. 1 and 2 are modified to require production of information responsive to the requests commencing with the start of plaintiff's incarceration i n 1/29/07, and including, if they exist, any medical records which pre-date 1/29/07 but were placed in plaintiff's prison medical file on or after that date. b. Request No. 3 is quashed. Plaintiffs 68 Motion for Extension is GRANTED and plai ntiff's 5/20/13 69 reply is deemed timely filed. Plaintiff's 70 Notice will be disregarded. Plaintiff's 75 Motion for Extension is DENIED as unnecessary. Plaintiff's 72 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's [7 3] Motion for Appointment of Counsel isDENIED. Plaintiff's 76 Motion for extension of time to respond tointerrogatories is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall serve his responses to interrogatories within 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff 39;s 78 Motion to serve a subpoena duces tecum on California Medical Facility is DENIED without prejudice to plaintiff's right to propound discovery during the extended period of discovery set in the revised scheduling order that accompanies this order. 79 Motion for Order extending discovery and dispositive motion deadlines is GRANTED. A revised scheduling order is issued concurrently with this order. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 8/15/2013 (Meuleman, A).
|
March 12, 2013 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/12/2013 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 58 are ADOPTED in FULL; Defendants' 41 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; and within 14 days from the date of this order defendants shall file and serve an answer to plaintiff's first amended complaint. (Reader, L)
|
January 8, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/7/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 50 motion for extension of time to file a second amended complaint is DENIED; plaintiff's 51 motion for extension of time to file an opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED; and RECOMMENDING that defendants' 41 motion to dismiss be denied; and defendants be directed to answer plaintiff's first amended complaint within 14 days of any order by the district court adopting these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
June 15, 2012 |
Filing
38
ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/14/2012 ORDERING that the 36 findings and recommendations filed 5/3/2012, are ADOPTED in full. Plaintiff's 2/16/2012 28 motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
|
May 3, 2012 |
Filing
36
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/2/12 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to assign this action to a United States District Judge; and RECOMMENDING that 28 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
January 30, 2012 |
Filing
26
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 01/27/12 granting 24 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted until 02/23/12 in which to file and serve an opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed within 7 days thereafter. Plaintiff's 1/23/12 motion for appointment of counsel 25 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/22/2011 ORDERING that, within 30 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the 15 motion to dismiss. (Yin, K)
|
September 9, 2011 |
Filing
11
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 9/8/11. The Clerk is directed to send to Plaintiff on USM-285 form, along with an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed 6/22/11; Within sixty days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall complete and submit the attached Notice of Submission of Documents to the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
July 12, 2011 |
Filing
5
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Mack West signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 07/11/11. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
|