Stevenson v. San Joaquin County
Petitioner: Huquinton Stevenson
Respondent: San Joaquin County
Case Number: 2:2011cv01732
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 11/20/2012 ORDERING that the Petition under 28:2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Court DECLINES to issue a Certificate of Appealability; Any further request for a Certificate of Appealability must be addressed to the Court of Appeals; The Clerk of the Court is to enter judgment accordingly. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/25/11 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Respondent shall file a response on or before 11/21/11; Petitioner's traverse is due 30 days thereafter. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 10/26/2011 (Meuleman, A).
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/11 ORDERING that Petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; w/i 30 days, petitioner shall file an amended petition; the Court is directed to send petitioner the form petition for a writ of habeas corpus by a state prisoner. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. San Joaquin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Huquinton Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: San Joaquin County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?