Wilkening et al v. Gags & Games, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joan Wilkening, Tara Missel and Christopher Hughes
Defendant: Gags & Games, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv01802
Filed: July 8, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 FINAL JUDGMENT signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/21/13. The Court hereby ENTERS final judgment in this case in accordance with the terms of the Settlement Agreement, the Order Granting Preliminary Approval, and this Order Granting Final Judgment, subject to the Court's normal retention of jurisdiction to oversee the settlement Neither this Final Judgment nor the Settlement shall constitute an admission by Defendants of any liability or wrongdoing whatsoever, nor is this Final Judgment a finding of the validity or invalidity of any claims in the action or a finding of wrongdoing by Defendant herein. The Court DISMISSES all claims in this action with prejudice, with each Party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs, exce pt as provided in the Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release of Claims ("Settlement Agreement") and the Court's Order Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Plaintiffs take nothing from the Complaint, except as stated in the 40 Joint Stipulation of Settlement and Release of Claims.(Meuleman, A)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/17/13 ORDERING that the Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement is due by 8/7/13; hearing on motion will be set for 8/21/13 at 9:30 a.m. (Manzer, C)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/14/13 GRANTING 39 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Meuleman, A) (Main Document 50 replaced on 5/16/2013) (Donati, J).
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/3/12: HEARING as to 22 Motion to Certify Class RESET for 2/6/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/26/2012 ORDERING that Defendant's 28 Motion to Conduct Depositions and Subpoena Documents is GRANTED. (Zignago, K.)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/6/2012 ORDERING that Plaintiffs shall have leave to file the proposed First Amended Complaint for Damages and Penalties. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within 15 days of the filing of said First Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/20/12 ORDERING that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification shall be filed on or before 10/5/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Manzer, C)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/30/2012 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification shall be filed on or before 8/15/2012. The Court further ORDERS that the 7/11/2012, hearing date on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is vacated and the new hearing date for said Motion is 9/19/2012 at 9:30 a.m. (Zignago, K.)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/3/2011 ACCORDINGLY 12 the parties Stipulated Protective Order is APPROVED. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkening et al v. Gags & Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gags & Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Wilkening
Represented By: Mary-Alice Coleman
Represented By: Michael Sasan Ahmad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Missel
Represented By: Michael Sasan Ahmad
Represented By: Mary-Alice Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hughes
Represented By: Michael Sasan Ahmad
Represented By: Mary-Alice Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?