Bell III v. University of California Davis Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: William Bell III
Defendant: Nancy Caratti, Yolanda Orosco, John Luke, MD, Katherine Salazar, Larry Vanderhoef, Ph.D., Virginia Hinshaw, Joseph Silva, M.D., Robert Chason, James A. Brunberg, MD, Sigrid Owyang, Sherri Stone, P. Haggard, Valerie Manuel, Misti Lang, Margarie Gorthy, Dana Whitfield, Debra Gage, Gearson Stauber, MD/AMD, Teresa Meagher, Barbara Bidigaire and University of California Davis Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2011cv01864
Filed: July 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/16/2013 ORDERING that the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss set for 9/15/2013 is VACATED; RECOMMENDING that defendants' 50 motion to dismiss be granted; Referred to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's.(Reader, L)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/13/13 ORDERING that the hearing date of August 21, 2013 is vacated. Hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss and motion to strike is continued to September 25, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Court room No. 26; Plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss and motion to strike, no later than September 11, 2013. Failure to file opposition and appear at the hearing will be deemed as a statement of non-opposition and shall result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Becknal, R)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/7/2013 ADOPTING, in full, 41 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 31 Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING, without leave to amend, Plaintiff's claims as to Title VII, wrongful termination, FMLA as to the Regents; GRANTING Plaintiff leave to amend the remaining claims. (Michel, G)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/6/13: RECOMMENDED that defendants' motion to dismiss be granted 31 . The following claims be dismissed without leave to amend: Title VII, wrongful termination, FMLA as to the Regents. Plaintiff be granted leave to amend the remaining claims. F&R referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/15/2013 ORDERING that the hearing date of 3/27/2013 is VACATED. Hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to 5/1/2013 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom no. 26. Plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss, no later than 4/17/2013. (Zignago, K.)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/21/12 SETTING Status Conference for 3/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The parties shall submit to the court and serve by mail on all other parties , no later than 14 days before the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference, a status report addressing the matters more clearly outlined within this order. Chambers to be notified immediately of any settlemetn or other disposition. The Clerk shall se nd plaintiff 3 copies of the Consent Form with this order. Plaintiff shall serve on each defendant within 10 days after the service of process, a copy of this order and a copy of the Consent form and shall file with the clerk a certificate reflecting such service. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 12/21/2012 (Meuleman, A).
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/25/2012 GRANTING 19 Plaintiff's application to proceed in IFP; the Clerk of the Court is directed to issue process and to send plaintiff an instruction sheet for service of process by the Un ited States Marshal, two ea USM-285 forms, a summons form, and an endorsed copy of plaintiff's 18 second amended complaint; within 30 days after this order is served, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the 2 properly completed USM-285 forms, co mpleted copies of the summons form, and the number of copies of the endorsed complaint and of this order required by the USM; the required documents shall be submitted directly to the USM either by personal delivery or by mail to the USM, Sacramento, CA; within 10 days after submitting the required materials to the USM, plaintiff shall file with this court a declaration stating the date on which he submitted the required documents to the USM; within 30 days after receiving the necessary materials from plaintiff, the USM is directed to serve process on defendants UC Davis Medical Center and Theresa Meagher, without prepayment of costs. (Reader, L) Modified on 10/26/2012 (Reader, L).
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/12/12 ORDERING that plf's 16 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED; the 15 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend; Clerk to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs; plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a properly completed application to proceed IFP; within 30 days an amended complaint shall be filed. (Benson, A.)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/10/2011 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 3 April 1, 2011, application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. The 1 complaint filed April 1, 2011 is DISMISSED with leave to ame nd. Within twenty-eight days from the date of this order, an amended complaint shall be filed that cures the defects noted in this order and complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Practice. The amended complaint must bear the case number assigned to this action and must be titled "Amended Complaint." Failure to respond to this order in a timely manner may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell III v. University of California Davis Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Caratti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Orosco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Luke, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Vanderhoef, Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Silva, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Brunberg, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigrid Owyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Haggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misti Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarie Gorthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gearson Stauber, MD/AMD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Meagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Bidigaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California Davis Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bell III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?