Celentano v. Sacramento Regional Transit District et al
Plaintiff: Georgia A. Celentano
Defendant: E-Tran, City of Elk Grove, Sacramento Regional Transit District and City of Elk Grove
Case Number: 2:2011cv01881
Filed: July 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that plaintiff's action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/24/12. F&R referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Kaminski, H)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE and ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/30/2012 ORDERING that within fourteen (14) days of this order, plaintiff shall file a declaration to SHOW CAUSE why monetary sanctions should n ot be imposed against plaintiff for her failure to cooperate in good faith with scheduling of the VDRP session in accordance with the court's prior order. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, defendants shall file a declaration outlining the expenses reasonably incurred by defendants in connection with coordinating and scheduling the VDRP session. A status (pre-trial scheduling) conference is set for 8/29/2012 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom no. 26 before the undersigned. Plaintiff shall personally appear at the conference. The parties shall file a joint status report in accordance with this order no later than 8/22/2012. (Zignago, K.)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/19/12: The March 21, 2012 status (pre-trial scheduling) conference is vacated. Plaintiff is granted leave to serve and file a second amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of service of this order. This case is referred to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP"). The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order on the VDRP coordinator. (cc: VDRP)(Kaminski, H)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/9/12 ORDERING that plaintiff shall either file a status report or a statement of consent to referral to VDRP by March 14, 2012. (Becknal, R)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/15/12: Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order defendant City of Elk Grove shall pay to the United States Marshal the sum of $60.10, and defendant E-Tran, City of Elk Grove s hall pay to the United States Marshal the sum of $70.30, unless within that time these defendants file written statements showing good cause for their failure to waive service. The court does not intend to extend this fourteen day period. 2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (cc:USM)(Kaminski, H)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/24/11 ORDERING 5 Findings and Recommendations are vacated; 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is granted; The Clerk is directed to issue the order setting status conference; The USM is directed to se rve process within 90 days of the date of this order; The Clerk shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form for each defendant, one summons, a copy of the complaint, and this court's order setting status conference. Plaintiff is to submit appropriate paperwork to the USM within 14 days from the date this order is filed. The Clerk to serve a copy of this order on the USM.(Matson, R)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/28/2011 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice; Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these F & R's. (Reader, L)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/25/2011. Within 20 days from date of this Order, plaintiff shall submit appropriate filing fee. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celentano v. Sacramento Regional Transit District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Tran, City of Elk Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Regional Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Elk Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia A. Celentano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?