Roberts v. Roseville Police Department
Plaintiff: Blanche A. Roberts
Defendant: Roseville Police Department
Case Number: 2:2011cv02207
Filed: August 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/26/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to L.R. 110; F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(b); REFERRING this matter to Judge Troy L. Nunley; ORDERING that objections be filed within fourteen days. (Michel, G)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/13/2014 ORDERING that the administrator of the estate's 22 motions for order substituting personal representative and for leave to file supplemental complaint are DENIED without prejudice to their re-filing it in accordance with this order within thirty days. Defendants' 24 request for dismissal is DENIED without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/5/13 ORDERING that Defendants shall serve the May 13, 2013, statement noting death on both (a) plaintiffs last known address, and (b) Eddie Drivers last known address of 2200 W. San AngeloSt. Apt. #2142W, Gilbert, AZ 85233-2212 (ECF 17-1 at 2), pursuant to Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 25(a)(3) within 21 days of this order; and Defendants shall file a certificate of service reflecting such service with thecourt.(Dillon, M)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/5/2013 ORDERING that Defendants shall serve the 5/13/2013, statement noting death on both (a) plaintiff's last known address, and (b) Eddie Driver's last known address of 2200 W. San Angelo St. Apt. #2142W, Gilbert, AZ 85233-2212, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(3) within twenty-one days of this order. Defendants shall file a certificate of service reflecting such service with the court. (Zignago, K.)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/9/2012 ORDERING 8 Plaintiffs # 9 motion for leave to amend is GRANTIED; Service is again appropriate for the following defendants: Officers Eastman, Simon, Christian, and the City of Roseville a nd the Roseville Police Dept.; because the United States Marshal is already in receipt of all necessary forms except for the requisite copies of the Second Amended Complaint, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission of Documents and submit to the USM 6 copies each of the Second Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this order; plaintiff need not attempt service on defendants and need not request waiver of service; within 10 days of submission of the documents to the USM, plaintiff shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted; the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM, Sacramento, CA. (cc: USM) (Reader, L)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 3/19/12: Service is appropriate for the following defendants: Officers Eastman, Simon, Christian, and the City of Roseville and the Roseville Police Department. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff 6 USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed January 9, 2012. (Kaminski, H)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/8/11. Amended Complaint due within 30 days; 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Roseville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanche A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?