Bowie v. High Desert State Prison
Plaintiff: Robert Bowie
Defendant: High Desert State Prison
Case Number: 2:2011cv02212
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/2011. CASE CLOSED. (Duong, D)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/11: Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a form for filing a civil rights action under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Kaminski, H)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 8/22/11. Case Transferred to Sacramento Division; The New Case Number is 2:11-cv-02212-KJN(PC). (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowie v. High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?