Zakskorn et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stacie Zakskorn, Jessica Melgoza and Rachelle Schreiber
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc. and Honda Motor Company, LTD
Case Number: 2:2011cv02610
Filed: October 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/8/15 GRANTING 79 Motion for Final Approval of the Class and Collective Actions Settlements. (Meuleman, A)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/10/14. The Court GRANTS Preliminary approval of the proposed notice and ADOPTS the notice-and-hearing schedule. Plaintiffs' consent Motion to file a consolitated complaint and stay defendants' response pending resolution of class settlement is likewise GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/2/2014. As set forth above, the 64 Supplemental Motion for Appointment of Counsel GRANTED. Court is APPOINTING as class counsel: (1) Caddell & Chapman, (2) Strategic Legal Practice, APC, (3) the Law Office of Robert L. Starr, (4) Mazie Slater Katz & Freeman, LLC and (5) Bursor & Fisher, PA. Caddell & Chapman is designated liaison counsel. (Marciel, M)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/24/13. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that within 7 days of the date of this order, plaintiffs shall show cause why they should not face dismissal or some other sanction for failure to prosecute.(Meuleman, A)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER 31 signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/29/2012. Information designated as "Confidential" pursuant to this Order shall NOT be made available to any person or entity except as authorized by this Order and shall be used by persons or entities to which it is produced solely for purposes of lititation and any attendant Appeal. (Marciel, M)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/13/12; It is hereby ORDERED that CIV S-11-3120 WBS DAD is reassigned from Judge Shubb to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Drozd to Magistrate Judge Newman. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as:CIV S-11-3120 KJM-KJN. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. It is further ORDE RED that the pretrial scheduling conference set for February 16, 2012 in Civ. No. 11-3120 is hereby vacated. A new scheduling conference on both cases is set for March 29, 2012 at 2:30 p.m. The parties joint pretrial conference statement is due no later than March 19, 2012. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zakskorn et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Zakskorn
Represented By: Michael A Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Melgoza
Represented By: Michael A Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Schreiber
Represented By: Michael A Caddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Norman C Hile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda North America, Inc.
Represented By: Norman C Hile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Motor Company, LTD
Represented By: Norman C Hile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?