Roberts et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Harris, Caroline Harris, Darin Hudson, Jodi Hudson, Wayne Kellerman, Amy Kellerman, Nagia Khalil, David Langdon, Kelly Langdon, Stanley Lee, Olivia Lopez, Vincent Mosca, Mark Motell, Denise Munson, Darlene Narcisse, Ross Nisly, Bertha Nisly, Edward Pagiegal, Maiah Perrier, Dale Rhodes, Peter Rooney, Steven Ross, Michael Russo, Corina Rust, Steven Rust, Donald Sessions, Rufus Stafford, Karthik Subramani, Teri Violano, Arian Wood, Elba Garza, Hector Garza, Victor Gritchenko, Galina Gritchenko, Dale Guiducci, Shirley Guiducci, Farid Hassad, Mitchell Cross, Dawn-Ellen Cross, Jay Dodson, Laura Dodson, Nicholas Ellsmore, Salvador Fuentes, Martha Fuentes, Baltazar Gallardo, Arabella Cortez, Tito Cortez, Linda Roberts and Mahein Azar
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Bank of America Funding 2007-6
Case Number: 2:2011cv02684
Filed: October 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/7/12 ORDERING that this matter is REMANDED to the State Court. Counsel for Plaintiffs is SANCTIONED in the amount of one hundred and fifty dollars ($150.00) This sum shall be paid to the Clerk no la ter than thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall file an affidavit accompanying the payment of this sanctions which states that is is paid personally by counsel, out of personal funds, and is not and will not be billed, directly or indirectly, to the client or any way made the responsibility of the client as attorneys' fees or costs. Copy of remand order sent to Sacramento County Superior Court. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/24/2012. A Further Status Conference set for 3/12/2012 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). (Marciel, M)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/10/12 GRANTING extension of time by 1/20/12 for defendant, Bank of America, N.A., to respond to First Amended Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/13/11 ORDERING that the 12/19/12 hearing on the 11 Motion to Dismiss and 12 Motion to Strike is VACATED; these motions are DENIED as MOOT; Counsel for plaintiffs is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days of the issuance of this order why sanctions of $150 should not issue for failing to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the pending motions, as required by this court's 11/10/11 order, as permitted by Local Rule 110. Defendant's deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint is 01/02/12. (Benson, A.)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER 17 to extension of time signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 11/9/2011. The Hearing on defendants' 11 12 Motions to Dismisss and Strike is CONTINUED to 12/19/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK). Plaintiffs shall file an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Motions no later than 12/5/2011. Defendants may file a Reply Brief no later than 12/12/2011. (Marciel, M)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of RECUSAL signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/12/11. Judge William B. Shubb recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton for all further proceedings. Any dates previously set in this case are hereby VACATED.(Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., a corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Harris
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Harris
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Hudson
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Hudson
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Kellerman
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Kellerman
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagia Khalil
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Langdon
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Langdon
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Lee
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Lopez
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Mosca
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Motell
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Munson
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Narcisse
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Nisly
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Nisly
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Pagiegal
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maiah Perrier
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Rhodes
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Rooney
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ross
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Russo
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corina Rust
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rust
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Sessions
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus Stafford
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karthik Subramani
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Violano
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arian Wood
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elba Garza
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Garza
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Gritchenko
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galina Gritchenko
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Guiducci
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Guiducci
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farid Hassad
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Cross
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn-Ellen Cross
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Dodson
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Dodson
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ellsmore
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Fuentes
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Fuentes
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baltazar Gallardo
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arabella Cortez
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tito Cortez
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Roberts
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahein Azar
Represented By: Terry John Thomas
Represented By: Kristin Lynn Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher A. Carr
Represented By: Viddell Lee Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Funding 2007-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?