Minhas v. Vilsack
Plaintiff: Manbinder Singh Minhas
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Case Number: 2:2011cv03200
Filed: December 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Agriculture
Cause of Action: 07:2321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/20/2011 granting plaintiff's. The 6-Month Disqualification is STAYED until there is a final determination on the merits. (Marciel, M)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/13/2011 SHORTENING time re 13 Motion to Stay. Motion Hearing SET for 12/19/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Opposition due by 12/15/2011 at 12:00 PM. (Michel, G)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/05/11 ORDERING that plaintiff has not filed a motion to stay, therefore, the notice requirement in 7 U.S.C. § 2023(a)(17) need not be addressed, and plaintiff's 8 Application to Shorten Time is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minhas v. Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manbinder Singh Minhas
Represented By: Thomas S. Knox
Represented By: Stephen John Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: Sylvia Ann Quast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?