USA v. Approximately $49,360.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $49,360.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $9,166.84 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $4,795.00 in U.S. Currency, Assortment of Jewelry Valued at Approximately $6,100.00, 2006 Maserati Quattroporte, VIN: ZAMCE39A660021662, License Number 5SSH877 and 2004 Dodge Stratus, VIN: 1B3EL36X94N192290, License Number 5ZAT819
Case Number: 2:2011mc00030
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/1/16. (Kaminski, H)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/11/2015 ORDERING 43 the parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 3/14/2016.(Reader, L)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/4/15 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:15-CR-00230 GEB be reassigned to Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set before Judge Burrell in this reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as 2:15-CR-00230 JAM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of criminal cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Kastilahn, A)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/10/2015 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 12/14/2015. (Zignago, K.)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION and ORDER 37 for extension of time signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/9/2015. The deadline by which United State shall file a Complaint for Forfeiture against defendant assets and/or obtain Indictment alleging assest are subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 9/14/2015. (Marciel, M)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/6/2015 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 6/15/2015. (Zignago, K.)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to file complaint for forfeiture in rem and/or to obtain indictment to 12/15/14 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/4/14.(Manzer, C)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or an indictment to 12/15/14 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/9/14. (Manzer, C)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/16/14 re: 29 EXTENDING Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture. (Meuleman, A)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/19/14: The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to June 17, 2014. (Kaminski, H)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/2013 ORDERING that the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to 3/19/2014. (Zignago, K.)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/18/2013 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 12/19/2013. (Zignago, K.)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER 21 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/13 ORDERING that the deadline for the United States to file a complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an indictment alleging forfeiture is EXTENDED to 9/20/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/14/2013 ORDERING that the United States file a Complaint for Forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an Indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture by 6/21/2013. (Michel, G)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER 17 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/19/12; The parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to March 21, 2013. (Matson, R)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/11/12 ORDERING the parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to December 21, 2012. (Becknal, R)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER 13 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/12/12 ORDERING that the deadline for the USA to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 9/21/2012. (Kastilahn, A)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/22/12 EXTENDING time for filing a Complaint for forfeiture and/or to obtain an Indictment alleging forfeiture. (Meuleman, A)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/22/11 ORDERING that the parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to March 21, 2012. (Becknal, R)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 9/19/11 ORDERING that the parties agree that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture shall be extended to December 21, 2011. (Becknal, R)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 6/16/11 EXTENDING deadline to September 21, 2011 by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject to forfeiture. (Meuleman, A)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 3/22/11 ORDERING the deadline by whichthe United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant assets and/or to obtain anindictment alleging that the defendant assets are subject toforfeiture shall be extended to 6/21/11. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $49,360.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $49,360.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,166.84 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $4,795.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assortment of Jewelry Valued at Approximately $6,100.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Maserati Quattroporte, VIN: ZAMCE39A660021662, License Number 5SSH877
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2004 Dodge Stratus, VIN: 1B3EL36X94N192290, License Number 5ZAT819
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?