Mills v. Virga et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Daniel Mills
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Tim Virga
Case Number: 2:2012cv00166
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Placer
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/24/13 recommending that that defendants motion to dismiss 25 be granted. This action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Motion 25 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/04/13 regarding the hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss 25 . ( Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire.) (Plummer, M)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/28/13 ordering that the parties agree and stipulate that the deadline to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint is extended for 45 days to and including 05/17/13. (Plummer, M)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/21/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff is directed to complete service as necessary, and, if not necessary, to file with the court any appropriate affidavits or motions.(Dillon, M)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/3/12 ORDERING that within 14 days, plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Dillon, M)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/2/12. Defendants McElroy and Wong are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. (Manzer, C)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 06/13/12 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to issue and send plaintiff 2 summonses, for defendants Murray and Holloway. The clerk shall also send plaintiff 3 copies of the form consent to proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge with this order. Plaintiff shall complete service of process on defendants within 60 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order and a copy of the form Consent to proceed bef ore magistrate Judge on each defendant at the time the summons and complaint are served. Plaintiff's status report shall be filed within 90 days from the date of this order. Defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. (Copy of this order, 2 summonses and 3 consent to proceed before magistrate forms sent to attorney for plaintiff by mail)(Plummer, M)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 04/23/12 ORDERING that the first amended complaint is dismissed with leave to amend with respect to defendants Murray, Holloway and Breckenridge and the retaliation claim, within 28 days from the date of service of this order. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants Mcelroy and Wong be dismissed from this action. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/6/2012 ORDERING that within 21 days, plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why the claims in the original complaint should not be screened out, or plaintff may file an amended complaint. (Yin, K)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/24/2012 ORDERING 3 Motion for TRO is DENIED without prejudice. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Virga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Julia Mary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Daniel Mills
Represented By: Julia Mary Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?