Bigoski-Odom v. Solano County Justice Center et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Bigoski Odom
Defendant: Solano County Justice Center, Gary R. Stanton, Marsh and James Firman
Case Number: 2:2012cv00197
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/01/17 RECOMMENDING that defendants's unopposed motion for summary judgment 52 be granted. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 52 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 09/29/2017. The court DECLINES to adopt the findings and recommendations 53 and REMANDS the matter back to the magistrate judge. (Andrews, P)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/08/17 RECOMMENDING that defendant's unopposed motion for summary judgment 52 be granted in part as to plantiff's Eighth Amendement claim based on the temporar y discontinuation of HIV/AIDSA medication and denied in part as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim based on transfer to the general population. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 52 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/22/2016 ADOPTING IN FULL 44 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERING that this action proceed against Defendant Firman only. (Michel, G.)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/03/16 recommending that defendant's unopposed motion for summary judgment 41 be granted. Judgement be entered in favor of defendant Jeffrey. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 41 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE 37 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/15. The F&Rs are not adopted. The 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. The 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. This matter is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Manzer, C)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/3/15 RECOMMENDING that Defendants unopposed motion for summary judgment 33 be granted; Judgment be entered in favor of defendant Jeffrey; and Defendant Firman be dismissed for failure to effect timely service ofprocess. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/5/13 ORDERING that plaintiffs second amended complaint 15 is dismissed with leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order.(Dillon, M)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/05/12 ordering plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 13 is denied as unnecessary. Plaintiff also seeks an update from the court on the status of his case. A review of the court's docket reflects that plaintiff's first amended complaint was dismissed on 10/22/12 with leave to file a second amended complaint within 30 days of that date. (Plummer, M)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/19/2012 ORDERING the Clerk to terminate Gary R. Stanton, Marsh and Solano County Justice Center as defendants to this action and add Jessie as a named defendant; plaintiff's 10 first amended complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 6/25/2012 ORDERING that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend; and plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/5/12 ORDERING that 7 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; Plaintiff is required to pay the full statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action; Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a cop y of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the address shown above; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc Financial)(Dillon, M)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/6/2012 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a complete ifp application with the required certified trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and the clerk to send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigoski-Odom v. Solano County Justice Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Bigoski Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Firman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?