Donna O'Connor-Rose v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Donna Ruth O'Connor-Rose
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Case Number: 2:2012cv00225
Filed: January 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/10/14: 58 Defendant's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this Order and close the file. (Kaminski, H)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/6/2014 DENYING 74 Defendant's Request to Appear Telephonically at the 2/10/2014 summary judgment motion hearing. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/2014 ORDERING that plaintiff's 57 motion to enforce the settlement agreement is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/8/2014 granting 62 JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s request to appear telephonically at Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement hearing now set for January 13, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 53 Stipulation and Proposed Order signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/4/2013 continuing the deadlines as follows: a) Discovery due by 9/27/2013; b) Dispositive Motions filed by 10/28/2013; c) Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and d) Bench Trial set for 3/4/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/11/2013 CONTINUING the deadline for Expert Disclosure to 4/29/2013; CONTINUING the deadline for Rebuttal Expert Disclosure to 5/24/2013. (Michel, G)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/24/13 CONTINUING deadlines as follows: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/15/2013, Rebuttal due 5/10/13; Discovery due by 6/28/2013; last day to file pre-trial motions due 7/29/2013; Bench Trial set for 12/3/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Meuleman, A)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/11/13: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/28/2013; Rebuttal expert disclosures due by February 25, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 08/02/2012 GRANTING re 30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action. (Streeter, J)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting Defendant's Request to Appear by Telephone 34 at the 7/30/2012 Motion to Dismiss and the 9/17/2012 Scheduling Conference signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/19/2012. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/25/2012 granting 32 Plaintiff's Request to appear by telephone at the September 17, 2012 Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is now reset for 9/17/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 9/4/2012. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/29/2012 granting 28 Plaintiff's Request to appear by telephone at the July 23, 2012 Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is now reset for 7/23/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 7/9/2012. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re 17 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 5/2/2012: Chases motion to dismiss plaintiffs claim for constructive fraud be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint, if she can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/24/2012 granting 22 Plaintiff's Request to appear by telephone at the May 7, 2012 Motion Hearing at 2:00 p.m., and the Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is now reset for 6/11/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 5/29/2012. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference calls. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 4/9/2012 granting defendant's Request to Appear Telephonically 19 at the Motion to Dismiss hearing on 5/7/2012 at 2:00 p.m. and at the Scheduling Conference on 5/14/2012 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/13/12 DENYING 8 Motion to Remand and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 5 Motion to Dismiss; Amended Complaint due within 20 days. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donna O'Connor-Rose v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Ruth O'Connor-Rose
Represented By: Michael A. Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A
Represented By: Mark Leonard Block
Represented By: Amy Duncan
Represented By: Laurie Hoefert Selkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?