Hellmann-Blumberg v. University of the Pacific
Plaintiff: Utha Hellmann-Blumberg
Defendant: University of the Pacific
Case Number: 2:2012cv00286
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/3/2014. The 12/11/2014 Final Pretrial Conference and 2/23/2015 Jury Trial dates are VACATED due to scheduling conflicts. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer as to whether both parties are willing to attend a Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge and whether parties are amenable to consenting to jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge in order to have their Trial concluded in a more timely matter. Parties are ordered to file a Joint Statement within 30 days of entry of this Order notifying Court as to whether a Settlement Conference would be beneficial and whether they would like to consent to urisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. (Marciel, M)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/21/14: Jose Luis Fuentes Counsel of record for Plaintiff Utha Hellmann-Blumberg terminated. (Kaminski, H)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/27/14 ORDERING that the Final Pretrial Conference is CONTINUED to 12/11/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; the Jury Trial is CONTINUED to 2/23/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; and the deadline to file the Joint Pretrial Statement is CONTINUED to 12/4/2015. (Kastilahn, A)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/13/14 DENYING 65 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Meuleman, A)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/27/14 ORDERING that Defendant UOP's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's supplemental disclosure of Dr. Keefe and for exclusion of any testimony by Dr. Keefe concerning the matters first disclosed in Plaintiff's supplement disclosure 98 is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/6/2013 GRANTING 78 Plainitffs request to seal documents; plaintiff may file pages 1 - 48 of the documents identified in her Request; said documents shall remain under SEAL until such time the Court orders otherwise for good cause shown or by stipulation of the parties. (Reader, L)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/16/13 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 62 MOTION to COMPEL Subpoena Document of non-retained expert Maria Pallavicini. (Meuleman, A)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/15/2013 DENYING 58 and 59 Motions to Compel. (Donati, J)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 32 MOTION to STRIKE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/5/13. (Kaminski, H)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/13 GRANTING IN PART 27 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Defendant shall produce to plaintiff's counsel the requested documents identified within this pleading within 28 days of the date of service of this Order. (Meuleman, A)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/19/13 ORDERING that the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order 10 is MODIFIED and the time to complete Discovery is EXTENDED to 8/23/2013. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/12/2013 DENYING plaintiff's 3/22/2013 26 Motion for Sanctions. (Marciel, M)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/29/2013 ORDERING, for the stated reasons in this order, Plaintiff's disparate impact claim is DISMISSED, and the remainder of Defendant's 14 Motion for Judgment is DENIED. (Waggoner, D)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/5/2013 ORDERING that if counsel is unable to file a stipulation and proposed protective order, plaintiff's counsel may file a notice of motion and motion for a protective order. If this matter must be resolved by the court on a noticed motion and the court determines that either party was unreasonable in failing to reach a stipulated protective order as previously directed, sanctions will be imposed. (Zignago, K.)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/14/13: Defendant shall produced the requested documents and provide the further discovery responses within twenty-eight days of the date of service of this order. (Kaminski, H)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/31/12 re 11 Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by University of the Pacific; IT IS ORDERED that the parties' October 30, 2012 request for entry of the proposed stipulated protective order (Doc. No. 11) is denied without prejudice. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hellmann-Blumberg v. University of the Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utha Hellmann-Blumberg
Represented By: Jose Luis Fuentes
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of the Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?