Goshert v. City of Vallejo
Plaintiff: Michael Goshert, Kenneth McKay, Lynn Schulte and Nicholas Rolley
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Case Number: 2:2012cv00287
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/27/12 ORDERING that this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety as to all parties pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) based upon the terms and conditi ons stated in the Settlement Agreement and General Release of Claims filed on 8/17/12 17 and incorporated herein by reference; That any action to enforce the parties' Settlement Agreement and General Release of Claims be brought in the Superio r Court of California, in and for the County of Solano and/or the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, to the extent of this Court's jurisdiction; and That the Clerk of the Court enter final judgment dismissing this action with prejudice and in its entirety. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/02/12 ORDERING that the Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 11/01/12 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Benson, A.)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/27/12: Scheduling Conference RESET for 8/9/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Parties shall file a joint status report no later than August 2, 2012. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goshert v. City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Goshert
Represented By: Jason M. Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth McKay
Represented By: Jason M. Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Schulte
Represented By: Jason M. Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Rolley
Represented By: Jason M. Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?