Rushdan v. Hamkar et al
Plaintiff: Saladin Rushdan
Defendant: Hamkar, Sahota, S Ali, A. Nangalama, J. Bal, D. E. Thor and J. Walker
Case Number: 2:2012cv00562
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/19/19 DENYING 124 Motion for enforcement of the settlement agreement. This case shall remain closed. (Plummer, M)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/11/16 denying 118 Motion to enforce settlement agreement. Plaintiffs identical motion in No. 2:14-cv-0853 KJN 95 is denied. Plaintiffs identical motion in No. 1:14-cv-1807 DLB 26 is denied. (Plummer, M)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 03/29/16 ORDERING pursuant to the foregoing stipulation, the action DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Jackson, T)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/22/2016 ORDERING that the Secretary of CDCR, Scott Kernan, is ADDED to this lawsuit as a Defendant. Defendants Ali, Hamkar, and Nangalama are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/16/15 ordering the custodian to produce Robert Stanley Woods aka Saladin Rushdan on 2/16/16 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 24 before Magistrate Jud ge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out to Court Desk. (cc: OTCD). (3 certified copies of this writ served on the Warden, CSP-Corcoran) (Plummer, M) Modified on 12/16/2015 (Plummer, M).
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/9/2015 ORDERING, within 30 days, the parties to inform this court's ADR divison, in writing, if they believe a settlement conference would be beneficial. (cc: ADR) (Yin, K)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER adopting in full 103 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/25/15. Defendants Hamkar, Ali, Nangalama, Tharratt, Toche, and Beard's 82 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED. Defendant Kelso's 85 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. (Kastilahn, A)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/14/15 recommending that defendants Hamkar, Ali, Nangalama, Tharratt, Toche, and Beard's motion to dismiss 82 be granted in part and denied in part as follows: a. Denied as to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims against Hamkar, Ali, and Nangalama; and b. Granted as to plaintiff's contract claims against Tharratt, Toche, and Beard. Defendant Kelso's motion to dismiss 85 be granted. Motions 82 and 85 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/09/14 granting 99 Motion to enforce appointment of Counsel. Douglas R. Thorn is appointed as counsel in the above entitled matter. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Douglas R. Thorn, Law Office of Douglas R. Thorn, 7601 Watson Way, Citrus Heights, CA 95610. (Plummer, M)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/20/2014 GRANTING Ms. Toor's 96 motion to withdraw as attorney; and the Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Division, so that substitute of counsel may be appointed as soon as practicable. (cc: ADR) (Yin, K)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/27/2014 and agreed between the parties to EXTEND the time for defendants to file their response to the first amended complaint. Defendants Hamkar, Ali, Nangalama, Tharratt, Thoche and Beard shall file their response no later than 9/30/2014. (Yin, K)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/14/14 denying 66 Motion for screening order. Defendants are granted 21 days from the date of this order to file either an opposition or statement of non-opposition to plaintiff's 03/14/14 motion to amend. (Plummer, M)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/24/14 ORDERING that the deadline of February 21, 2014 to submit a proposed amended discovery schedule is vacated; and plaintiff shall file any motion to amend the complaint on or before March 14, 2014. (Dillon, M)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/22/14 granting 61 Motion to Vacate the discovery order. The 10/29/13 discovery and scheduling order is vacated. The scheduling conference set for 02/19/14 at 9:00 a.m. before the district judge is vacated. Counsel for the parties shall meet and confer regarding discovery issues and submit a proposed amended discovery schedule to the undersigned within 30 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/23/13 ORDERING that 56 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED; Manmeet Toor is appointed as counsel in the above entitled matter. Appointed counsel shall notify Sujean Park at (916) 930-4278, or via email at spark@caed.uscourts.gov if he has any questions related to the appointment. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Manmeet Toor.(Dillon, M)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/24/2013 ADOPTING 44 Findings and Recommendations in full and GRANTING 19 Motion to Dismiss as follows: Defendants Sahota and Bal are DISMISSED from this action; Plaintiff claims that defend ants denied him post-surgical pain medication in violation of the eighth amendment are DISMISSED; Plaintiff's state law claims are DISMISSED; Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief is MOOT; and Defendants Hamkar, Ali and Nangalama are DIRECTED to file an answer to the remaining claims in this action. (Donati, J)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/6/13 RECOMMENDING that Defendants October 19, 2012 motion to dismiss 19 be granted to the following extent: a. Defendants Sahota and Bal are dismissed from this actio n; b. Plaintiffs claims that defendants denied him post- surgical pain medication in violation of the Eighth Amendment are dismissed; c. Plaintiffs state law claims are dismissed; d. Plaintiffs request for injunctive relief is moot; and Defendants Hamkar, Ali, and Nangalama be directed to file an answer to the remaining claims in this action. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/24/13 denying 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's 12/20/12 motion for an extension of time 31 is partially granted to the following extent: Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order to file a sur-reply to defendants' 10/19/12 motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's 12/26/12 motion of corrections 33 is partially granted by the relief set forth in (2). (Plummer, M)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/27/12 denying 21 Motion for temporary restraining order for the reasons set forth above. (Plummer, M)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/01/12 ordering plaintiff's claims against defendants Walker and Thor are dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to amend his c omplaint to cure the deficiencies outlined in this order. Plaintiff is not required to file an amended complaint, but failure to do so will be construed as plaintiff's consent to the dismissal of the above mentioned defendants and cause of action. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushdan v. Hamkar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saladin Rushdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Nangalama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. E. Thor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?