Fuentes v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Floyd Fuentes
Defendant: T. Bartos and T. Young
Case Number: 2:2012cv00573
Filed: March 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/13/13 ORDERING the clerk of the court randomly assign a District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Troy L. Nunely randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion to dismiss 30 be granted; and this case be dismissed without prejudice. MOTION to DISMISS 30 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (cc: AC) (Plummer, M) Modified on 5/14/2013 (Plummer, M).
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Floyd Fuentes signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 9/20/2012. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/30/12 ORDERING that 10 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED without prejudice; Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statemen t for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint and the certification required on the application form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/8/12 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner; and PlaintiffS March 16, 2012 motion for copies is denied without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuentes v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?