McNeely v. Chappell
Petitioner: Dock McNeely
Respondent: Kevin Chappell
Case Number: 2:2012cv00931
Filed: April 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/04/14 ordering petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus is denied. All outstanding motions are denied. The court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. The clerk of the court is directed to close the case. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/4/2014 DENYING petitioner's 27 , 35 motions for reconsideration. (Yin, K)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/5/13 ORDERING that Petitioners motion to vacate the reference to a United States Magistrate Judge, ECF No. 31 , is DENIED; and Petitioners motion for sanctions, ECF No. 33 , is DENIED. (Dillon, M)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/13/2013 ORDERING that if petitioner seeks to withdraw his consent he shall file a motion and demonstrate what extraordinary circumstances exist that justify the request. (Yin, K)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/27/2013 DENYING petitioner's 23 reqeust for sanctions. (Yin, K)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/14/12 denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel and denying 13 Motion for an evidentiary hearing. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeely v. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dock McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?