Thompson v. George Delallo Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin J Thompson
Defendant: George Delallo Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01058
Filed: April 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER CLARIFICATION signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/2014 re 96 Order. (Zignago, K.)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/3/2014. The 12/11/2014 Final Pretrial Conference and 2/9/2015 Jury Trial dates are VACATED due to scheduling conflicts. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer as to whether both parties are willing to attend a Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge and whether parties are amenable to consenting to jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge in order to have their Trial concluded in a more timely matter. Parties are ordered to file a Joint Statement within 30 days of entry of this Order notifying Court as to whether a Settlement Conference would be beneficial and whether they would like to consent to urisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. (Marciel, M)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/30/2014 DENYING 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Donati, J)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/15/2013 GRANTING 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint; Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file his proposed First Amended Complaint within 3 days after issuance of this order; Per FRCP 15(a), DeLallo Italian Foods, Inc. must file a responsive pleading within 14 days after service of the amended complaint. (Reader, L)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/8/13: Defendant George DeLallo Company, Inc.'s counter-motion for order of dismissal of George DeLallo Company, Inc. is DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant may re-file this motion in the proper form on the court's law and motion calendar. Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint will remain on calendar to be heard on Monday, January 14, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 4. (Kaminski, H) .
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/20/12: All law and motion shall be completed by10/18/2013; all Discovery shall be completed by 8/18/2013; Motions to compel discovery must be noticed on the magist rate judge's calendar and shall be heard not later than 7/18/2013; The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 1/21/2014 at1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; The Jury Trial is SET for 4/22/2014, at 10:30 a.m.. in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. A Settlement Conference will be set before a judge other than the trial judge at the time of the Pretrial Conference. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. George Delallo Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J Thompson
Represented By: Larry L. Baumbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Delallo Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?