October 6, 2017 |
Filing
186
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/06/17 ORDERING the Clerk to change the short title of this action to reflect the dismissal of all defendants except Jennifer Shaffer; and GRANTING IN PART the 175 Motion to Extend Jurisdiction; the court's jurisdiction shall terminate upon compliance with this order or one year from the date of this order, whichever is sooner. (Benson, A.)
|
June 24, 2016 |
Filing
170
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/23/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss all Defendants except Jennifer Shaffer 169 is GRANTED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
May 27, 2016 |
Filing
167
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 05/26/16 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed TO FILE the 168 comments received from inmate Avon Davies nunc pro tunc to 02/08/16; the 158 Joint Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement Agreement is GRANTED. (Benson, A)
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing
159
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/10/15 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to file the motion filed by Inmate Alden A. Thomas and enter it on the docket in this action; Inmate Alden's motion is denied as unnecessary; and to the extent the motion contains comments relevant to the proposed settlement agreement, those will be considered by the court in connection with the fairness hearing set for December 18, 2015. (Becknal, R)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing
154
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/30/2015 GRANTING defendants' 133 request. The last sentence of this court's order filed 11/24/2014, (ECF No. 90 at 3) is AMENDED to read as follows: Defendants shall remit payment to Plaintiffs' counsel in the amount of $119,796.05, within thirty (30) days after the Court grants final approval of the parties Amended Stipulated Settlement, subject to interest thereafter as provided in 28 U.S.C. § 1961. (Yin, K)
|
November 10, 2015 |
Filing
90
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/09/15 granting 86 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall remit payment to plaintiff's counsel in the amount of $119,796.05, not later than 30 days after the filing date of this order, subject to interest thereafter as provided in 28 USC 1961. (Plummer, M)
|
October 7, 2015 |
Filing
84
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/6/2015 GRANTING 79 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; DIRECTING the parties to prepare within three days, a final version of the Stipulated Settlement removing paragraph 15 and incorporating the dates set forth in this order; DIRECTING the defendants to post within fourteen days, notice in English and Spanish in all housing units of all prisons housing prisoners who are serving life sentences and are eligible for pa role consideration after having served their minimum terms; ORDERING the defendants to file and serve on the plaintiffs a declaration that notice was published consistent with this order; SETTING a Final Fairness Hearing for 12/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; ORDERING that any further briefing from the parties in advance of the hearing be filed by 12/4/2015; ORDERING that any comments regarding the fairness of the settlement be postmarked by 11/13/2015 and mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court, Eastern District of California, 501 "I" Street, Sacramento, CA 95814. (Michel, G.)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing
68
ORDER ADOPTING 62 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/14/15. The 55 Motion for Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Amended Complaint due within 30 days. The Motion to dismiss all defendants other th an the Governor and EO of the BOP Hearings is DENIED. The 66 Motion to Modify the Pretrial Scheduling Order is GRANTED. All previously set dates are VACATED. Status Conference reset for 8/13/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Manzer, C)
|
February 19, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER RE: PRO SE PRISONER FILINGS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/19/2015 ORDERING the Clerk shall not file in this action any documents submitted by prisoners proceeding pro se; all documents bearing this case name and/or number whic h are submitted to the Clerk by a prisoner proceeding pro se shall be returned to the prisoner, together with a copy of this order; prisoners proceeding pro se may forward their requests or questions to counsel of record for plaintiff class, Keith A. Wattley.(Yin, K)
|
December 3, 2014 |
Filing
62
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/02/14 recommending that defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings be granted as to claims 4,5,9, and 12 and otherwise denied. That plaintiff be granted 30 days of the date of this order to file an amended complaint alleging only the 2 remaining claims, or to file a statement that it will stand on the surviving claims of the current complaint construed by the court; and that defendants' motion to dismiss defendants be denied. MOTION 55 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/31/2014 ORDERING 40 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are ADOPTED in full; 29 Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED; 30 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as provided in th is Order; Status Conference SET for 5/1/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Parties shall confer and, at least seven days prior to the status conference, file a Joint StatusReport that includes the Rule 26(f) disco very plan, with all named parties participating in the preparation and completion of the report. The court, upon review of the joint status report and following the status conference, will issue a scheduling order governing the future course of the l itigation. In the extraordinary event the parties are not able to file a joint status report, each party must file an individual status report and attach a declaration setting forth, in detail, the extraordinary circumstances that prevented the parties from filing a joint status report.(Waggoner, D)
|
November 1, 2013 |
Filing
40
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/31/13 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery responses (ECF No. 25 ) is construed as a motion to reopen discovery and as such is GRANTED in part; The court declines to order responses to plaintiffs previously propounded discovery requests, but will set a new schedule for discovery and dispositive motions following the district courts ruling on the Findings and Recommendation that follow; Within 14 days of the district courts ruling on the Findings and Recommendations regarding class certification and defendants motion for summary judgment, the parties shall file status reports; it is RECOMMENDED that Petitioners motion for class certification (ECF No. 29 ) be granted; Defendants motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 30 ) be granted in part and denied in part (see order for details). Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
August 29, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/29/2013 ORDERING 24 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING Order is herein AMENDED to state that L.R. 230(l) does not apply to this action; rather, all motions must be briefed in accordance with the other providsions of L.R. 230; 25 30 Motions Hearing RESET for 10/16/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire.(Waggoner, D)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/10/2013 ORDERING 20 that Luis Renteria's motion to be joined in this action is DENIED. (Reader, L)
|
October 18, 2012 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/18/2012 GRANTING 11 Amended Motion to Dismiss; ALLOWING Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 28 days. (Michel, G)
|
September 10, 2012 |
Filing
14
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/10/2012 and agreed between the parties to RE-SET the hearing on defendants' 11 motion to dismiss to 10/4/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; plaintiff's opposition due on or before 9/20/2012, and defendants' reply, if any, due on or before 9/27/2012. (Yin, K)
|
June 7, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/6/12 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to issue and send plaintiff seven summonses, for defendants Shaffer, Cate, Brown, Kusaj, Hayward, Powers and Fulbright. The Clerk shall als o send plaintiff eight copies of the form Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge with this order. Plaintiff shall complete service of process on the defendants within 60 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order and a copy of the form Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge on each defendant at the time the summons and complaint are served. (Dillon, M)
|