Valdez v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Ruben Valdez
Defendant: Matthew Cate, Tim Virga, L. Johnson-Dovey, C. Villasenor, T. Ventimiglia, J. Mayhew, J. Beeson, D. Jakabosky, L. Wallace, D. Foston, D. Stark, C. Cannedy, C. Finnegan, A. May, I. O'Brian, E. Jubb, A. Guzman, D. Rothchild and S. Kokkonen
Case Number: 2:2012cv01352
Filed: May 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/29/2018 GRANTING 99 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties may file objections to 95 Findings and Recommendations within 30 days of the date of this order. (Huang, H)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/29/18 RECOMMENDING that defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings 60 be granted. Motion 60 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/27/18 DENYING 90 Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reopen this case, randomly assign a District Judge and update the docket to reflect the new case number. U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez randomly assigned to this action. The new case number is 2:12-cv-1352 JAM CMK (PC). (Plummer, M)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/31/2016 ORDERING that this 85 appeal is not frivolous or taken in bad faith. Plaintiffs in forma pauperis status may continue on appeal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Pro Se Unit at the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cc USCA) (Butolph, J)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/30/16 granting 60 Motion on the pleadings. The clerk of the court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. All pending motions are denied as moot. (Plummer, M)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/25/2016 GRANTING plaintiff's 63 motion for additional time to oppose defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings and plaintiff's opposition is considered timely filed. De fendants' 61 motion for protective order is GRANTED to the extent the court will suspend any further discovery until resolution of the motion for judgment on the pleadings. Defendants' 68 motion for additional time to respond to disc overy requests is GRANTED. Defendants' 72 motion to modify the scheduling order is GRANTED. The parties need not respond to any outstanding discovery requets until after the resolution of the motion for judgment on the pleadings. The dates set forth in the court's scheduling order are VACATED, and a new scheduling order will issue following resolution of the motion for judgment on the pleadings.(Yin, K)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/22/13 ordering plaintiff's first amended complaint 33 is dismissed. Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint 32 is denied without prejudice to renewal within 30 days of the date of this order, accompanied by a proposed amended complaint that satisfies Rule 8's pleading requirements. (Plummer, M)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/30/2013 GRANTING 16 Motion for service of the complaint. Foston, Stark, and Mayhew are DISMISSED from this action. Service is APPROPRIATE for Defendants: Cate, Virga, Johnson-Dovey, Villaseno r, Ventimiglia, Beeson, Jakabosky, Wallace, Cannedy, Finnegan, May, O'Brian, Jubb, Guman, Rothchild, and Kokkonen. The Clerk shall send 1 USM-285 forms for each Defendant, summons, instruction sheet, and a copy of the complaint. Within 30 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall complete the Notice of Submission.. (Donati, J)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/26/13 ordering that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 18 is denied. (Plummer, M)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/29/2013 DENYING 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and DENYING 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or Motion for TRO. (Donati, J)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/9/12 ORDERING that 11 and 12 Motions to Proceed IFP are GRANTED; the director of the CDC is directed to collect and forward payment from the prison trust acco unt of Ruben Valdez to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders ) (Dillon, M)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 07/10/12 ordering plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdez v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Virga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Johnson-Dovey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ventimiglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mayhew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Jakabosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Foston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cannedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. O'Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Jubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Rothchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Kokkonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?