Robinson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Daniela Robinson
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv01373
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/20/15 ORDERING that This Action is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice, with each side bearing its own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/16/2015 GRANTING 68 the parties EXTENSION of time to complete settlement and comply with Local Rule 160(B), to 11/19/2015. (Reader, L)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/4/2015 GRANTING 66 Request for One-Week Extension of Time; ORDERING the parties to complete settlement and comply with Local Rule 160(B) by 11/12/2015. (Michel, G.)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/30/15 ORDERING pursuant to the above request the Court grants the five-day extension of time to complete settlement and comply with Local Rule 160(B), from October 30, 2015 to November 4, 2015, as requested. (Becknal, R)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 REQUEST for Extension of Time to complete settlement signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/23/15. (Kaminski, H)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/5/2015 ORDERING 59 MetLife shall deliver to plaintiff's counsel, no later than the close of businesson 10/8/2015, a fully completed draft of a settlement proposal such that, if plaintiff executed the document as is, this case would be resolved. (Reader, L)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/24/15 ORDERING that the following dates and deadlines as EXTENDED as follows: Expert Discovery Disclosure Deadline: 9/14/15, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline: 9/28/15, Discovery Cutoff: 1 1/16/15, Deadline for Filing of Motions for Summary Judgment: 12/16/15, Deadline for Hearing of Motions for Summary Judgment: 1/13/16, Joint Pretrial Statement Due: 2/12/16, Pre-Trial Conference SET for 2/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez, Jury Trial SET for 3/28/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/28/14: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 8/14/2015. Discovery due by 10/16/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/18/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 5/27/2014 ORDERING that plaintiff MetLife may file its Amended Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Counterclaim, as stipulated by the parties. (Zignago, K.)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/21/2014. (Zignago, K.)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/18/2013. Plaintiffs 5/30/2013 34 Motion to Compel Discovery is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth more fully above. Defendant shall comply to the extent further action is required within 14 days from date of Order. (Marciel, M)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/4/2013 DENYING plaintiff's 18 25 Motions to Compel. (Marciel, M)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/27/13 DENYING 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant is to pay a $100 sanction within 10 days. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniela Robinson
Represented By: Daniel Scott Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?