Bowen v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Burch Michael Bowen
Defendant: Matthew Cate, Phyllis Milliner, Jeffrey Carrick, Gary Swarthout, McAlpine, Shaddy, James D. Hartley, Donald B. McElroy, Robert Chapnick, Meet Boparai, Conanan and Gary Kamen
Case Number: 2:2012cv01519
Filed: June 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/15/15 ordering this action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/6/2015 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 62 are ADOPTED in FULL; Plaintiff's claims for prospective injunctive relief and his state claims are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to pros ecute pursuant to FRCP 41(b); Defendant Beard is DISMISSED from this action because no claims remain against him; Defendants Boparai, Carrick, Chapnick, Conanan, McAlpine, McElroy, Millner, Shadday, and Swarthout are ordered to answer the remaining claims within 30 days from the electronic filing of this order.(Reader, L)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/02/15 recommending that plaintiff's claims for prospective injunctive relief and his state law claims be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant t o FRCP 41(b). Defendant Beard be dismissed from this action because no claims remain against him. Defendants Boparai, Carrick, Chapnick, Conanan, McAlpine, McElroy, Milliner, Shadday and Swarthout be ordered to answer the remaining claims within 30 days from the date of the district judge's review and adoption of the instant findings and recommendations. MOTION to DISMISS 54 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/30/15 ORDERING that within 21 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of non-opposition.(Dillon, M)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/18/15 denying 57 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the filing of this order to file and serve a response to the defendants' motion to dismiss 54 . Defendants' reply, if any, shall be filed and served within 7 days thereafter. (Plummer, M)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/28/14 DENYING 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/2/13 ORDERING that Within twenty-one days of the date of this order, CMF Law Library SupervisorSanchez shall inform the court why plaintiff is not being provided the copies required to serve the second amended complaint pursuant to a court order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order by mail on CMFLaw Library Supervisor Sanchez at California Medical Facility at each of the following addresses: a) P.O. Box 2500, Vacaville, CA 95696-2500; b) 1600 California Drive, Vacaville, CA 95696. Plaintiffs requests for the appointment of counsel (ECF Nos. 27 and 28 ) aredenied.(Dillon, M)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/16/13 ordering the order to show cause 19 is discharged and no sanctions will be imposed at this time. Plaintiff's request for a 30 day extension of time to file a second amended complaint 21 is granted and the second amended complaint shall be filed no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's pro se request for appointment of new counsel 20 is denied. (Plummer, M)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 06/27/13 ordering plaintiff's limited-appointment counsel Gregory P. Wayland shall show cause within 14 days from the date of this order why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with a court order. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Gregory P. Wayland, Law Office of Gregory P. Wayland, 1010 Sagamore Way, Sacramento, CA 95822. (Plummer, M)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/18/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 1014/2012 amended complaint is DISMISSED; Gregory P Wayland is APPOINTED for the limited purpose of drafting and filing a second amended complaint; the seco nd amended complaint shall be filed within 60 days; Gregory P. Wayland's appointment will terminate when plaintiff's second amended complaint is filed; and the Clerk shall serve a copy of this order upon Gregory P. Wayland. (cc: ADR)(Yin, K)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/13/2012 ORDERING plaintiff's attorney's request for authority to incur costs by appointed pro bono counsel Gregory Wayland is GRANTED. (Crouch, J)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/15/12 ORDERING that 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED for the limited purpose of drafting and filing an amended complaint. Gregory P. Wayland is appointed as limited purpose counsel for the limited purpose of drafting and filing an amended complaint. The amended complaint shall be filed within 60 days. Gregory P. Waylands appointment will terminate when plaintiffs amendedcomplaint is filed. Gregory P. Wayland shall notify Sujean Park if he has any questions related to the appointment. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order upon Gregory P. Wayland.(Dillon, M)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Burch Michael Bowen signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/13/2012. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forwar d to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/22/2012 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a completed affidavit to proceed ifp; the clerk to send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a certified trust account statement.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowen v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burch Michael Bowen
Represented By: Gregory Paul Wayland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Milliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Carrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Swarthout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAlpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald B. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chapnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meet Boparai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Kamen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?