Lopez v. Colusa County Sheriff Dept. et al
Plaintiff: |
Jesus Andres Lopez |
Defendant: |
James Holt and Austin |
Case Number: |
2:2012cv01571 |
Filed: |
June 12, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Colusa |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/4/14 ORDERING that this action is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
|
January 27, 2014 |
Filing
39
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/2014 ORDERING that, within 14 days, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to defendants' 38 motion for summary judgment. (Yin, K)
|
December 10, 2013 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/10/13 GRANTING 36 Motion for Extension of time. Within fifteen days of the date of this order, defendants shall file a second motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs remaining Fourteenth Amendment claims. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion within thirty days of service of the motion. Defendants shall file a reply, if any, within fourteen days of service of plaintiffs opposition.(Dillon, M)
|
November 21, 2013 |
Filing
35
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/20/13 ordering defendants motion for summary judgment which addresses only plaintiff's claim of defendants' treatment of his diabetes condition was constitutionally inadequate 24 is gr anted. Within 30 days of the date of this order, defendants may file a motion for leave to act out of time to file a second motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's 14th amendment claims regarding defendants treatment of his high blood pressure, acid reflux, and restless leg syndrome conditions. If defendants choose not to file such a motion the court will issue an order setting this matter for a settlement conference and further pretrial proceedings. (Plummer, M)
|
November 6, 2013 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/06/13 ordering that within 10 days of the date of this order, defense counsel shall file defendant Nurse Holt's Exhibit A, a true and correct copy of plaintiff's jail medical file. (Plummer, M)
|
March 29, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/28/13 ordering plaintiff's motion for leave to amend 23 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 23 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
July 6, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/5/12 ORDERING the Sheriff of Colusa County to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Jesus Andres Lopez to the clerk until the balance of $350 i s paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Colusa County. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial )(Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?