United States of America et al v. Cottage Bakery, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and San Joaquin Valley Unified Air Pollution Control District
Defendant: Cottage Bakery, Inc. and Ralcorp Frozen Bakery Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01697
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7413
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/6/2017 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 21 that the Consent Decree entered by this Court in this action on 8/19/2013 is TERMINATED. (Reader, L)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/16/13 ORDERING that the Court DECLINES to reassign Ralcorp Holdings under Local Rule 123(c). (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/27/12 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 4 Motion For Entry of Consent Decree. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Cottage Bakery, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lori Beth Jonas, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Joaquin Valley Unified Air Pollution Control District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottage Bakery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralcorp Frozen Bakery Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?