Morris v. Mini et al
Plaintiff: Leon Morris
Defendant: V Mini, Cannedy and L. Turner
Case Number: 2:2012cv01774
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/29/19 RECOMMENDING that Defendants' 37 motion to dismiss be granted and that this action be dismissed without leave to amend and with prejudice. Matter REFERRED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court. (Kastilahn, A)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/29/2018 DENYING 38 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may file an opposition to 37 Motion to Dismiss within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's request for copies of the court's file is DENIED without prejudice to seeking copies from the Clerk of the Court at $.25 per page. (Huang, H)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/4/2018 ORDERING defendants to file a response to 34 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Washington, S)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/13/2017 GRANTING 32 Request for Additional Time. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send plaintiff a copy of the original complaint. (Hunt, G)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/18/17 DENYING 30 Motion to Stay. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a copy of the undersigned's findings and recommendations granting the defendants' motion to d ismiss 26 and the District Court's order adopting those findings and recommendations 29 . Within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint or inform the court if he wishes to voluntarily dismiss this case. (Plummer, M)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/8/2016 ADOPTING IN FULL 26 Findings and Recommendations; GRANTING 21 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERING the plaintiff to file an amended complaint in compliance with the Magistrate Judge's 26 Findings and Recommendations within 30 days. (Michel, G.)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/25/2016 RECOMMENDING that defendant's 21 unopposed motion to dismiss be granted leave to file an amended complaint in order to attempt to cure the defects noted in these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 20 days. (Yin, K)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/17/2014 GRANTING plaintiff's 8 motion to proceed IFP; plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee; CDCR shall collect, from the prison account of Leon E. Morris, an initial partial filing fee and then after, monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full; the Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR; and the Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/11/2013 RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 8 motion to proceed ifp be denied, plaintiff be barred from proceeding ifp in this action uner the three strikes provision of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and this case be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/4/2012 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a complete application to proceed ifp with the required trust account statement or the appropriate filing fee; and the clerk to send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Mini et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Mini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?