Bontemps v. Salinas, et al
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Bontemps
Defendant: Salinas, Neves, Abbott and Shillford
Case Number: 2:2012cv02185
Filed: August 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/30/15 recommending that motion for summary judgment 51 be granted and complaint 1 be dismissed without prejudice. F&R referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections to F&R due within fourteen days. (Kaminski, H)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/18/2015. Defendants' 52 Motion for Protective Order staying Discovery is GRANTED. Defendants' 59 Motion to Vacate dates in 46 Discovery and Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Plaintiff� 39;s 58 Request for Extension of Time to file an Amended Opposition is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have 30 from date of this Order in which to file an Amended Opposition. Defendants shall have 7 days from date plaintiff's Amended Opposition is filed to file a Reply to plaintiff's Amended Opposition. (Marciel, M)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/13/14 ordering plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing within 30 days of the date of this order, why this lawsuit should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Discovery is temporarily stayed in this case pending resolution of this order to show cause and defendant's motion to stay discovery. (Plummer, M)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/14/14 denying 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/13/14 ORDERING that The AMENDED Findings and Recommendations filed 4/11/144 40 are ADOPTED in full; Defendants' MOTION to Revoke Plaintiff's IFP 25 is DENIED; Defendants' alternative REQUEST for Sanctions also is DENIED; The Clerk is directed to Strike Plaintiffs MOTION for Reconsideration 41 from the docket.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 04/11/14 recommending that defendants' motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status 25 be denied; and defendants alternative request for sanctions also be denied. MOTION Order Revoking Pltf's In Forma Pauperis Status 25 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/1/2014 ORDERING that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(3) this action is returned to the magistrate judge with instructions. (Zignago, K.)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/08/14 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to assign a District Judge to this action. U.S. District Judge Troy L. Nunley randomly assigned to this action. The clerk of the court shall ame nd the docket to designate the 11/07/13 order as findings and recommendations that defendants motion to revoke plaintiff's in forma pauperis status be granted on the ground that plaintiff is barred from proceeding in this action under the 3 strikes provision of 28 USC 1815(g). Plaintiff is granted 14 days from the date of this order to file supplemental objections to the findings and recommendations. (Plummer, M)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/6/2013 ORDERING 25 Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is REVOKED pursuant to 28:1915(g); The order granting plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 10 is VACATED; The order directing the CDCR to make payments to the court from plaintiff's prison trust account for payment of the filing fee for this action 11 is VACATED; The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on: the Director of the CDC R; and the Financial Dept, USDC EDCA, Sacramento Division; Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, the $350.00 filing fee for this action; Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. Defendants, request for terminating sanctions is DENIED. (cc: CDCR, CFS). (Reader, L)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/7/2013 GRANTING plaintiff's 14 request to dismiss defendant Salinas, and defendant Salinas is DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. (Yin, K)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/14/2013 GRANTING plaintiff an additional 30 days to file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in the court's proceeding on the original complaint, against defendants Neves, Abbots, and Shillford only. (Yin, K)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Gregory C. Bontemps signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/21/2012. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/24/2012 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk to send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bontemps v. Salinas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Bontemps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shillford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?