Warren v. Sam's West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Warren
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc. and Wal Mart Stores Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv02315
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sutter
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/8/14 ORDERING Pursuant to the parties' stipulation and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the Clerk of the Court is ordered to CLOSE this case. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/21/2013 DISMISSING this action in its entirety against Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., without prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1) re 24 Stipulation for Dismissal. (Michel, G)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/7/2013 ORDERING that the Court's 12 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order is MODIFIED such that the non-expert witness discovery will now be completed by 11/15/2013. All other due dates set forth in the Court's Pre-Trial Scheduling Order are VACATED, and an amended Pre-Trial Scheduling Order will issue forthwith. (Zignago, K.)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/4/2013. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Sam's West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Shelor Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Alice Shelor Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Warren
Represented By: Mark Peter Velez
Represented By: Karen Asplund Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?