Paris v. Brazil, et. al.
Plaintiff: Michael Paris
Defendant: E. Brazil
Case Number: 2:2012cv02383
Filed: September 18, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/05/15 ordering the Custodian to produce Joseph Becker on 1/12/15 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD) (Plummer, M)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/15/2014 ORDERING the custodian to produce Michael Paris G-03234, to testify in USDC at 9:00 AM on 1/12/2015 in courtroom #24, before Judge Ca rolyn K. Delaney; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and the Warden. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/8/14 ORDERING that the Pretrial Order 48 is hereby vacated; and the Clerk of Court is directed to withdraw the assignment of a district judge to this action. This case will now be referenced as 2:12-cv-2383-CKD. (cc MCE)(Dillon, M)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/3/2014 AFFIRMING the 7/21/2014 order of the Magistrate Judge and DENYING plaintiff's 44 motion. (Yin, K)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/25/14 denying 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/21/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 40 motion to "[Rescind] Motion and Discovery Cut-off Dates". (Yin, K)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/3/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 37 request for reconsideration. (Yin, K)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/21/2014 ORDERING that within 15 days, the parties shall submit confidential settlement statements as set forth in this order; and the Clerk shall send a copy of this order to ADR Division, Attention Sujean Park. (cc: ADR)(Yin, K)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full, signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/28/2014. Defendant's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. (Marciel, M)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/16/13 RECOMMENDING that 20 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/2/13 DENYING 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Michael Paris signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/26/12. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paris v. Brazil, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?