Bell et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Henry, Martin Gama and Sandy Bell
Defendant: John Brooks and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv02499
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 171 WITHDRAWAL of #168 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Mezias, Donna)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/31/2018 ORDERING the Hearing on Defendant's #168 Motion for Summary Judgment is Reset to 12/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Reader, L)
May 30, 2018 Filing 169 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Hearing re #168 Motion for Summary Judgment by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Banerjee, Arnab) Modified on 5/31/2018 (Kaminski, H).
May 1, 2018 Filing 168 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Proposed Order)(Mezias, Donna)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/11/2017 DENYING #161 Motion for Reconsideration. (Hunt, G)
November 30, 2017 Filing 166 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/30/2017: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for December 5, 2017 is/are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (Streeter, J)
November 28, 2017 Filing 165 OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs Sandy Bell, Martin Gama to #163 Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Banerjee, Arnab)
November 28, 2017 Filing 164 REPLY by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama re #161 Motion for Reconsideration. (Banerjee, Arnab)
November 21, 2017 Filing 163 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in re #162 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mezias, Donna)
November 21, 2017 Filing 162 OPPOSITION by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. to #161 Motion for Reconsideration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Barnaby, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christine Barnaby)(Mezias, Donna)
October 23, 2017 Filing 161 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #158 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama, Michael Henry. Motion Hearing SET for 12/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Arnab Banerjee, #3 Proposed Order)(Banerjee, Arnab)
October 20, 2017 Filing 160 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Banerjee, Arnab)
September 29, 2017 Filing 159 MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file an updated joint status report on or before October 20, 2017. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/7/2017 ORDERING #146 the Court GRANTS Home Depot's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Reader, L)
July 19, 2017 Filing 157 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for July 25, 2017 is/are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
July 18, 2017 Filing 156 REPLY by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in Support of #146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Response, #2 Defendants' Reply (Mezias, Donna)
July 12, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama, Michael Henry: Deposition Transcripts. (Grant, Melissa)
July 11, 2017 Filing 154 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama, Michael Henry in re #153 Opposition to Motion,. (Grant, Melissa)
July 11, 2017 Filing 153 OPPOSITION by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama, Michael Henry to #146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Response to Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Plaintiffs Disputed Facts, #3 Objections to the Declaration of Christine Barnaby, #4 Declaration of Melissa Grant, #5 Declaration of Michael Henry, #6 Declaration of Sandy Bell, #7 Declaration of Martin Gama)(Grant, Melissa)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 06/05/17 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's #146 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is CONTINUED to 7/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A)
June 5, 2017 Filing 151 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Second Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue Hearing Date by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Mezias, Donna)
May 18, 2017 Filing 150 USCA ORDER - Petitioner's motion to take judicial notice (Docket Entry No. 2) is granted. Petitioner has not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. See Bauman v. U.S. Dist. Court, 557 F.2d 650 (9th Cir. 1977). Accordingly, the petition is denied. (Becknal, R)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/8/2017 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's #146 motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to 6/20/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Zignago, K.)
May 5, 2017 Filing 148 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Continue Hearing Date re #146 MOTION for Partial SUMMARY JUDGMENT by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Mezias, Donna)
May 2, 2017 Filing 147 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in re #146 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Mezias, Donna)
May 2, 2017 Filing 146 MOTION for PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Motion Hearing SET for 6/6/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Barnaby, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Proposed Order)(Mezias, Donna) Modified on 5/3/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #140 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/10/17. (Kastilahn, A)
March 1, 2017 Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER: The hearing on the motion(s) now calendared for March 7, 2017 is/are ordered submitted without appearance and without argument pursuant to Local Rule 230 (g). If the Court subsequently concludes that oral argument is necessary, a hearing will be set and the parties notified accordingly. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
February 28, 2017 Filing 143 REPLY in support of #140 Motion for Reconsideration by Martin Gama, Michael Henry. (Grant, Melissa) Modified on 3/1/2017 (Michel, G.).
February 21, 2017 Filing 142 OPPOSITION by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. to #140 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #113 Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael P. Ward, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Mezias, Donna) Modified on 2/22/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
February 7, 2017 Filing 141 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama in re #140 Motion for Reconsideration,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Grant, Melissa)
February 7, 2017 Filing 140 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #113 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Melissa)
January 25, 2017 Filing 139 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Banerjee, Arnab)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/11/16 ORDERING that this action is STAYED until 01/18/17; the deadlines set forth in the Court's #136 09/12/16 Scheduling/Stipulation and Order are VACATED; and the parties will file a joint status conference statement by 01/25/17 informing the Court of the outcome of mediation. CASE STAYED (Benson, A)
October 10, 2016 Filing 137 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Temporarily Stay Action Pending Mediation by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 10/11/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION and ORDER Re Consolidation of Bell and Henry and Continuance of Class Notice Deadlines, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/12/16. Bell and Henry are hereby consolidated for all purposes before Judge John A. Mendez, and all future filings shall be made ONLY in Case No. 2:12-cv-02499-JAM-CKD. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 9/13/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
September 9, 2016 Filing 135 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Order Re Consolidation of Bell and Henry and Continuance of Class Notice Deadlines by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Mezias, Donna)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/6/16 ORDERING that the Court DENIES plaintiffs' motion for change of venue. (Kastilahn, A)
September 2, 2016 Filing 133 PROPOSED ORDER re #114 Motion to Change Venue by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 9/6/2016 (Michel, G.).
September 1, 2016 Filing 132 USCA CASE NUMBER 16-16206 for #121 Notice of Appeal filed by Martin Gama, Sandy Bell. (Zignago, K.)
August 30, 2016 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Transfer Venue held on 8/23/16, before District Judge John A. Mendez, filed by Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran, Phone number 916-448-2712 E-mail kohalloran@comcast.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may also be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 9/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2016. (O'Halloran, K)
August 25, 2016 Filing 130 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re 128 Minutes for Motion hearing as to #114 Motion to Change Venue held on 8/23/2016 before Judge John A. Mendez by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Court Reporter Kelly O'Halloran. (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 8/26/2016 (Michel, G.).
August 24, 2016 Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama for proceedings held on August 23, 2016 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Banerjee, Arnab)
August 23, 2016 Filing 128 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 8/23/2016 ; Motions terminated: #114 Motion to Change Venue filed by Martin Gama, Sandy Bell ; denying #114 Motion to Change Venue. Plaintiffs Counsel M. Bainer present. Defendants Counsel D. Mezias present. Court Reporter: K. O'Halloran. (Vine, H)
August 16, 2016 Filing 127 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama in re #126 Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Banerjee, Arnab)
August 16, 2016 Filing 126 REPLY by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama to OPPOSITION TO #114 Motion to Change Venue.(Banerjee, Arnab) Modified on 8/17/2016 (Washington, S).
August 9, 2016 Filing 125 OPPOSITION by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. to #114 Motion to Change Venue. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donna M. Mezias, #2 Notice Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proof of Service)(Mezias, Donna)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER of USCA as to #121 Notice of Appeal, ORDERING that appellants' motion to dismiss this appeal is GRANTED. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the MANDATE of this court. (Kastilahn, A)
July 11, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE of association of counsel by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Setareh, Chaim Shaun added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Setareh, Chaim) Modified on 7/13/2016 (Kaminski, H).
July 8, 2016 Filing 122 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re #121 Notice of Appeal filed by Martin Gama, Sandy Bell. Notice of Appeal filed *7/7/2016*, Complaint filed *10/4/2012* and Appealed Order / Judgment filed *6/7/2016*. Court Reporter: *K. O'Halloran*. *Fee Status: Paid on 7/8/2016 in the amount of $505.00* (Attachments: #1 Appeal Information) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 8, 2016 RECEIPT number 0972-6551860 for $505.00 for #121 Notice of Appeal from Glenn A. Danas fbo Sandy Bell, and Martin Gama. (Kastilahn, A)
July 7, 2016 Filing 121 NOTICE of APPEAL by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama as to #113 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,. Attorney Danas, Glenn A. added. (Danas, Glenn)
June 22, 2016 Filing 120 AMENDED NOTICE of RELATED CASE 3:14-cv-04858 by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 6/23/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/16/2016 ORDERING that the deadlines set forth in the Court's 6/1/2016 Order shall be CONTINUED: Deadline for parties to lodge proposed class notice by 9/2/2016; parties to submit competing versions of class notice if parties cannot agree on content of class notice by 9/9/2016; Defendant to send class list to class counsel by 9/16/2016; Court to approve class notice by 9/23/2016; and class notice to be mailed to class members by 10/14/2016.(Reader, L)
June 15, 2016 Filing 118 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to continue class notice deadlines by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Mezias, Donna)
June 15, 2016 Filing 117 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Michael Henry to #114 Motion to Change Venue. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Setareh, Chaim)
June 9, 2016 Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs motion to change venue #114 has been noticed for hearing on a date no longer available. It is ordered that the motion is continued to August 23, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom #6. Opposition and reply briefs shall be filed in accord with Local Rule 230. The parties are advised that the Court requires that a courtesy hard copy of each pleading in motion practice is to be delivered at the earliest convenience to the Clerks office at 501 I Street, Ste. 400, Sacramento, CA 95814, to the Attention of Judge Mendez. If the filed motion(s) is/are for summary judgment, and deposition testimony is referenced in the pleadings, a hard copy of the entire deposition(s) is/are to be lodged with the Court. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
June 8, 2016 Filing 115 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama re #114 Motion to Change Venue filed by Martin Gama, Sandy Bell. (Grant, Melissa) Modified on 6/9/2016 (Washington, S).
June 8, 2016 Filing 114 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a)) by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Melissa) Modified on 6/9/2016 (Washington, S).
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #72 Motion for Summary Judgment. The reasons for the Courts Order are set forth in the transcript of the February 23, 2016 hearing, which is attached as Exhibit A and incorporated by reference herein. (Washington, S)
June 2, 2016 Filing 112 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Sandy Bell, Martin Gama to #111 Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order)(Perez, Raul)
June 2, 2016 Filing 111 PROPOSED ORDER re Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Minutes, ECF No. 92, by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 6/3/2016 (Kastilahn, A).
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/27/16 ORDERING that plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. (Kastilahn, A)
May 25, 2016 Filing 109 PROPOSED ORDER re #67 Amended #63 Motion for Class Certification by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Melissa) Modified on 5/26/2016 (Washington, S).
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 05/23/16 ORDERING that, pursuant to the parties' #107 Stipulation, the deadline for the parties' to jointly submit a proposed order granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification is CONTINUED TO 05/25/16. (Benson, A)
May 20, 2016 Filing 107 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Continue Deadline To Submit Joint Proposed Order re 103 Motion Hearing by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Melissa) Modified on 5/23/2016 (Washington, S).
May 6, 2016 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sandy Bell for proceedings held on 04/20/2016 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Banerjee, Arnab)
May 5, 2016 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT of Further Hearing on Motion for Class Certification held on 4/20/16, before District Judge John A. Mendez, filed by Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran, Phone number 916-448-2712 E-mail kohalloran@comcast.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may also be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 5/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2016. (O'Halloran, K)
May 2, 2016 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for proceedings held on April 20, 2016 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Kelly OHalloran. (Mezias, Donna)
April 20, 2016 Filing 103 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 4/20/2016 ; Motions terminated: #67 Amended #63 Motion for Class Certification filed by Martin Gama, Sandy Bell ; granting in part and denying in part #67 Motion to Certify Class. Counsel requested to prepare and submit a proposed order within 30 days. Plaintiffs Counsel M. Grant; A. Banerjee present. Defendants Counsel D. Mezias; J. Cohn present. Court Reporter: K. O'Halloran. (Vine, H)
April 12, 2016 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4-5-16, before District Judge John A. Mendez, filed by Court Reporter Michelle Babbitt, E-mail mbabbitt@caed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Reporter Babbitt or PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 5/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2016. (Babbitt, M)
April 11, 2016 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama for proceedings held on 04/05/2016 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Michelle Babbitt. (Perez, Raul)
April 11, 2016 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for proceedings held on 04/05/2016 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Michelle Babbitt. (Mezias, Donna)
April 5, 2016 Filing 99 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 4/5/2016 ; Continued Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez.); taking under advisement #67 Motion to Certify Class; denying #82 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs Counsel M. Grant; A. Banerjee present. Defendants Counsel D. Mezias; J. Cohn present. Court Reporter: M. Babbitt. (Vine, H)
March 7, 2016 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, held on February 23, 2016, before District Judge John A. Mendez, filed by Court Reporter Diane Shepard, Phone number 916-554-7460 E-mail diane.shepard@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 3/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (Shepard, D)
March 3, 2016 Filing 97 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama for proceedings held on February 23, 2016 before Judge John A.Mendez. Court Reporter Diane Shepard. (Banerjee, Arnab)
March 3, 2016 Filing 96 MINUTE ORDER: Due to crowded calendar conditions, the motion(s) #67 #82 now calendared for hearing on March 8, 2016 are ordered reset to Tuesday, April 5, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
March 1, 2016 Filing 95 REPLY IN SUPPORT by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama to #82 MOTION to STRIKE. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Raul Perez)(Perez, Raul) Modified on 3/2/2016 (Reader, L).
February 29, 2016 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for proceedings held on February 23, 2016 before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Reporter Diane Shepard. (Mezias, Donna)
February 23, 2016 Filing 93 OPPOSITION by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. to #82 MOTION to STRIKE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donna Mezias, #2 Exhibit A to D. Mezias Declaration)(Mezias, Donna) Modified on 2/24/2016 (Kaminski, H).
February 23, 2016 Filing 92 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge John A. Mendez: MOTION HEARING held on 2/23/2016 ; Motions terminated: #72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Stay Class Certification Proceedings filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., John Brooks ; granting in part and denying in part #72 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court invited defendant's to prepare a proposed order on the Court's rulings. Plaintiffs Counsel M. Grant; A. Banerjee present. Defendants Counsel D. Mezias; J. Cohn present. Court Reporter: D. Shepard. (Vine, H)
February 18, 2016 Filing 91 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiffs Sandy Bell, Martin Gama to #88 Supplemental Declaration of G. Edward Anderson. (Perez, Raul)
February 17, 2016 Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are reminded that if any deposition testimony is referred to in the summary judgment motion pleadings, hard copies of those depositions, in their entirety, are to be lodged with the Court at the earliest possible convenience. (Local Rule 133(j)) (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/16/2016 ORDERING attorney Joel M. Cohn, PHV added for John Brooks and Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Zignago, K.)
February 16, 2016 Filing 88 REPLY by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. in support of #72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Stay Class Certification Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Disputed Facts, #2 Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Supplemental Declaration of G. Edward Anderson, #4 Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Anderson Declaration)(Mezias, Donna) Modified on 2/17/2016 (Benson, A).
February 16, 2016 Filing 87 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for attorney Joel M. Cohn to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0972-6317955) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mezias, Donna)
February 9, 2016 Filing 86 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama in re #85 Opposition to Motion,,. (Perez, Raul)
February 9, 2016 Filing 85 OPPOSITION by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama to #72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Stay Class Certification Proceedings. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raul Perez, #2 Declaration of Robert Fountain, #3 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #4 Statement of Disputed Facts, #5 Objections to Declaration of G. Edward Anderson, #6 Proposed Order)(Perez, Raul) Modified on 2/10/2016 (Reader, L).
January 11, 2016 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re #78 Order Reassigning Retired or Senior Judge, #79 Civil New Case Documents for JAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mezias, Donna)
January 8, 2016 Filing 83 REPLY BRIEF by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama in SUPPORT of AMENDED MOTION #73 Opposition, #67 Amended #63 Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Objections, #2 Response To Defendants' Objections, #3 Response To Defendants' Objections)(Perez, Raul) Modified on 1/11/2016 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 8, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION to STRIKE Class Member Declarations Filed In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Amended Motion For Class Certification by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Declaration of Raul Perez, #3 Proposed Order)(Perez, Raul)
January 8, 2016 Filing 81 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER: In view of the 1/8/2016 reassignment of this matter to Judge Mendez, the Court issues the following scheduling order: The 1/25/2016 hearing on defendants motion #72 for partial summary judgment and to stay class certification proceedings is ordered continued to 2/23/2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom #6.The 2/8/2016 hearing on plaintiffs motion #67 for class certification is ordered continued to 3/8/2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom #6. Opposition and reply briefs shall be filed in accord with Local Rule 230. The April 25, 2016 status conference is vacated.(TEXT ENTRY ONLY)(Vine, H)
January 8, 2016 Filing 80 MINUTE ORDER: In view of the 1/8/2016 reassignment of this matter to Judge Mendez, the Court issues the following scheduling order: The 1/25/2016 hearing on defendants motion #72 for partial summary judgment and to stay class certification proceedings is ordered continued to 2/23/2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom #6.The 2/8/2016 hearing on plaintiffs motion #67 for class certification is ordered continued to 3/8/2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom #6.The April 25, 2016 status conference is vacated.(TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT (Attachments: #1 Order re Filing Requirements) (Donati, J)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the senior status of District Judge *Garland E. Burrell, Jr.*, this action is reassigned to *Judge John A. Mendez* for all further proceedings. (Becknal, R)
December 16, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Michael Henry re #75 MOTION to INTERVENE . (Setareh, Chaim)
December 14, 2015 Filing 76 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Michael Henry re #75 Motion to Intervene,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Setareh, Chaim) Modified on 12/15/2015 (Kaminski, H).
December 14, 2015 Filing 75 MOTION to INTERVENE by Michael Henry. Attorney Setareh, Chaim Shaun added. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of S. Setareh, #2 Exhibit #1 Declaration, #3 Exhibit #2 Declaration, #4 Exhibit #3 Declaration, #5 Exhibit #4 Declaration)(Setareh, Chaim) Modified on 12/15/2015 (Kaminski, H).
December 2, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE of RELATED CASE for 3:14-CV-04858 JST (USDC - Northern District of CA) filed by defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 12/3/2015 (Marciel, M)
November 24, 2015 Filing 73 OPPOSITION by defendants to #67 Amended #63 Motion for Class Certification. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Evidence, #2 Declaration of Barbara Pennington, #3 Declaration of Donna Mezias, #4 Exhibit A to Mezias Declaration, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Summary of Declaration Evidence, #11 Declaration of Ruth Abrego, #12 Declaration of Sam Chan, #13 Declaration of Maria Clark, #14 Declaration of Pandora Clements, #15 Declaration of Erica Coito, #16 Declaration of Alicia Fernandez, #17 Declaration of Brad Fornes, #18 Declaration of Stephanie Frost, #19 Declaration of Lucretia Heath, #20 Declaration of Mike Hooper, #21 Declaration of Kenneth House, #22 Declaration of Mario Howard, #23 Declaration of Amber Johnson, #24 Declaration of Anthony Kennedy, #25 Declaration of Charandev Lally, #26 Declaration of Diana McLean, #27 Declaration of Armando Mendieta, #28 Declaration of Luis Miguel, #29 Declaration of Jason Morre, #30 Declaration of Morris Mouton, #31 Declaration of Olivia Napoles, #32 Declaration of Rahman Nawabi, #33 Declaration of Ramona Nelson, #34 Declaration of Elsa Oellrich, #35 Declaration of Noelle Pacheco, #36 Declaration of Kamal Patel, #37 Declaration of Dorian Pech, #38 Declaration of Richard Real, #39 Declaration of Andy Reyes, #40 Declaration of Javier Rivera, #41 Declaration of Maria Rodriguez, #42 Declaration of Jorge Ruiz, #43 Declaration of Nury Santos, #44 Declaration of Gary Smith, #45 Declaration of Courtney Stansberry, #46 Declaration of Lionel Stevens, #47 Declaration of Russell Stevens, #48 Declaration of Priscilla Surita, #49 Declaration of Auria Tejeras, #50 Declaration of George Tucrkile, #51 Declaration of Juana Vasquez, #52 Declaration of Ray Vasquez, #53 Declaration of Pamela Wallace, #54 Declaration of Kyle West, #55 Declaration of Jacqueline Zarate, #56 Objections to Declarations submitted in support of plaintiffs' Amended Motion, #57 Objections to plaintiffs' Class Action Trial Plan) (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 11/25/2015 (Marciel, M)
November 19, 2015 Filing 72 MOTION for PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT and TO STAY CLASS CERTIFICATION PROCEEDINGS by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2016 at 09:00 AM before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Christine Barnaby, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Declaration of G. Edward Anderson Ph.D., #12 Exhibit A1, #13 Exhibit A2, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Proposed Order re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #16 Proposed Order re: Motion to Stay Class Certification Proceedings, #17 Proof of Service)(Mezias, Donna) Modified on 6/7/2016 (Washington, S).
October 22, 2015 Filing 71 SEALED EVENT (Reader, L)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING HOME DEPOT'S SEALING REQUEST signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/14/15. Home Depot shall provide to the Clerk an electronic copy of the documents to be filed under seal as prescribed in Local Rule 141(e)(2)(i) within seven (7) days from the date this order is filed.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/13/15 ORDERING that, pursuant to #68 Notice of Request to Seal Document, plaintiffs shall re-file the Redacted Motion for Class Certification, which will remove all redactions and be re-titled "Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification"; plaintiffs shall re-file the Redacted Declaration of Raul Perez, which will remove all redactions from Exhibits C-H, and J and be re-titled "Amended Declaration of Raul Perez"; Exhibit I to the Declaration of Raul Perez will remain redacted. This document will be submitted for in camera consideration as an exhibit to Defendant's Request to Seal, which Defendant will prepare and submit to the Court by 10/14/15; and the hearing and briefing schedule with respect to the Certification Motion shall remain unchanged. (Benson, A)
October 12, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Suomi, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian Suomi - Redacted Version, #3 Proposed Order)(Bertko, Liz)
October 9, 2015 Filing 67 AMENDED #63 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration of Raul Perez) (Perez, Raul) Modified on 10/13/2015 (Reader, L).
October 9, 2015 Filing 66 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for the Filing of Documents Originally Lodged Under Seal re #63 Motion to Class Certification, #65 Order, #64 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s) by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Attorney Banerjee, Arnab added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Banerjee, Arnab)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/29/2015 DENYING #64 Request to Seal Documents. (Michel, G.)
September 25, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE of REQUEST to SEAL DOCUMENT(S) pursuant to L.R. 141 in support of #63 Motion for Class Certification by plaintiffs. (Perez, Raul) Modified on 9/28/2015 (Marciel, M)
September 25, 2015 Filing 63 MOTION for CLASS CERTIFICATION by Sandy Bell and Martin Gama. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Motion for Class Certification #2 Redacted Declaration of Raul Perez in support, #3 Declaration of Sandy Bell, #4 Declartion of of Martin Gama, #5 Compendium of Class Member Declarations, #6 Class Action Trial Plan, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Proposed Order) (Perez, Raul) Modified on 9/28/2015 (Marciel, M)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/25/2015. No later than 8/27/2015, defendant shall produce page 39 of document titled "Your First 30 Days--I put customers FIRST" and page 60 of document titled "It's Good to be ORANGE--Associate Orientation 2014 First 30 Days Guide." The remainder of unhighlighted portions of documents need not be produced. (Marciel, M)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/20/15: The hearing date of August 26, 2015 on plaintiff's motion to compel (ECF Nos. 56, 58) is vacated. The motion to compel is granted in part. (Kaminski, H)
August 19, 2015 Filing 60 BRIEF Re Discovery Dispute by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Bertko, Liz) Modified on 8/20/2015 (Kaminski, H).
August 18, 2015 Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy K. Owen for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/18/2015: Pursuant to the parties' request, an informal conference call re discovery dispute is scheduled for 8/20/2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. To access the call, parties are instructed to dial the following: 877-848-7030 (phone), 7431521 (access code). Additionally, the parties shall file a joint letter brief, not to exceed four (4) pages, describing the nature of the dispute no later than twenty-four hours (24) prior to the conference call. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Owen, K)
August 5, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION to COMPEL Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One and for Rule 37 Sanctions Against Defendant by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perez, Raul) Modified on 8/5/2015 (Becknal, R).
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Compel, noticed for hearing before Judge Burrell on 9/14/15, is vacated. Pursuant to the Local Rules, Discovery motions are to be noticed for hearing before the assigned Magistrate Judge. re #56 Motion to Compel, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/5/15. (Furstenau, S)
August 4, 2015 Filing 56 MOTION to COMPEL Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.s Further Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and for Rule 37 Sanctions Against Defendant by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Attorney Perez, Raul added. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Perez, Raul) Modified on 8/5/2015 (Becknal, R).
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/28/2015. (Zignago, K.)
May 26, 2015 Filing 54 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order Governing Discovery by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bertko, Liz)
December 12, 2014 Filing 53 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Defendant John Brooks without prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(2) by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grant, Melissa) Modified on 12/16/2014 (Michel, G).
September 30, 2014 Filing 52 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Gloria C Jan terminated (Bertko, Liz)
September 26, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference RESET for 4/25/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. See #50 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order. (Michel, G)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/22/2014 VACATING the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 9/29/2014; ORDERING that the Motion for Class Certification be filed by 9/25/2015; ORDERING that an opposition or statement of non-opposition be filed by 11/24/2015; ORDERING that any reply be filed by 1/8/2016; ORDERING that the hearing on said motion be noticed for 2/8/2016 at 09:00 AM; SETTING a further Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference for 4/25/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING that a joint status report be filed fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference. (Michel, G) Modified on 9/26/2014 (Michel, G).
September 15, 2014 Filing 49 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Grant, Melissa)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER: The pretrial scheduling conference, currently set for 6/23/14, is rescheduled for 9/29/14, at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/13/14. (Furstenau, S)
June 9, 2014 Filing 47 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Attorney Gatto, Frank James added. (Gatto, Frank)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/4/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand #42 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Remand, scheduled for hearing on 4/21/14, is submitted without oral argument. There will not be a hearing on 4/21/14, and no appearance is necessary. re #42 Motion to Remand, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/16/14. (Furstenau, S)
April 14, 2014 Filing 44 REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of #42 Motion to Remand by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Grant, Melissa) Modified on 4/15/2014 (Michel, G).
April 7, 2014 Filing 43 OPPOSITION by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. to #42 MOTION to REMAND.(Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of G. Edward Anderson, PHD)(Mezias, Donna) Modified docket text on 4/8/2014 (Waggoner, D).
March 13, 2014 Filing 42 MOTION to REMAND for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Pursuant to Court Order of February 20, 2014 by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Melissa)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Melissa Grant for plaintiff Sandy Bell in place and instead of attorney Joseph Hoff, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 2/26/14. (Kastilahn, A)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Melissa Grant for plaintiff Martin Gama instead of and in place of attorney Joseph Hoff, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr., on 2/26/14. (Kastilahn, A)
February 25, 2014 Filing 39 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Sandy Bell. (Hoff, Joseph)
February 25, 2014 Filing 38 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Martin Gama. (Hoff, Joseph)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 2/20/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' pending remand motion, which is premised on an inapplicable standard, is DENIED. Further, Plaintiff shall file a brief no later than 3/13/2014 concerning the jurisdictional issue in light of Rodriguez v. AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. The hearing on the matter shall be noticed in accordance with the court's regularly scheduled law and motion matters. Further, the status conference currently scheduled for 4/28/2014, is RESCHEDULED to 6/23/2014 at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the status conference. (Zignago, K.)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: The pretrial scheduling conference, currently set for 3/3/14, is rescheduled for 4/28/14, at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/18/14. (Furstenau, S)
February 14, 2014 Filing 35 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER continuing the Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 2/18/2014 (Michel, G).
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER: A pretrial scheduling conference is set for 3/3/14 at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/21/14. (Furstenau, S)
January 21, 2014 Filing 33 USCA MANDATE: The judgment of this Court, entered 12/27/2013, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Zignago, K.)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/16/14. Added attorney Melissa Grant for Sandy Bell, attorney Mark Yablonovich TERMINATED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 27, 2013 Filing 31 USCA ORDER: The decision of the District Court is Vacated and Remanded. CASE REOPENED (Kastilahn, A) (Kastilahn, A).
December 24, 2013 Filing 30 USCA APPEAL FEES received in the amount of $ 505 (Receipt # 0972-5103171) from Rex Heinke on 12/23/2013 in USCA Case Number 13-17602. (Donati, J)
December 23, 2013 PAYMENT for Appeal to USCA in the amount of $ 505, receipt number 0972-5103171. (Heinke, Rex)
December 20, 2013 Filing 29 USCA CASE NUMBER 13-17602. The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 USC 1453 is granted. (Donati, J)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 12/5/2013 ORDERING attorney Melissa Grant added for Martin Gama, attorney Mark Yablonovich terminated. (Zignago, K.)
December 4, 2013 Filing 27 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Martin Gama. (Hoff, Joseph)
September 20, 2013 Filing 26 WITHDRAWAL of #24 Motion for Reconsideration of Remand Order by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mezias, Donna)
September 17, 2013 Filing 25 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Sandy Bell. (Hoff, Joseph)
September 5, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION of #23 Remand Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Donna M Mezias, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Mezias, Donna) Modified on 9/6/2013 (Becknal, R).
April 26, 2013 SERVICE BY MAIL: #23 Order, served on Sacramento Superior. (Becknal, R)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/25/13 ORDERING that for the stated reasons, Plaintiffs' motion to remand is granted. The case is remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California in the County of Sacramento, from which it was removed, and the action shall be closed. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Becknal, R)
April 19, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change in Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Roshanian, Neda)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: The pretrial scheduling conference, currently set for 4/15/13, is rescheduled for 6/10/13, at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/3/13. (Furstenau, S)
April 1, 2013 Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continue the Date of the Status Conference by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Hoff, Joseph)
March 27, 2013 Filing 19 Defendant's NOTICE of New Authority in SUPPORT of OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #15 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jan, Gloria) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: The Motion to Remand, scheduled for hearing on 2/4/13, is submitted without oral argument. There will not be a hearing on 2/4/13, and no appearance is necessary. re #9 Motion to Remand, Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 1/30/13. (Furstenau, S) Modified on 2/21/2013 (Furstenau, S).
January 28, 2013 Filing 17 Plaintiffs' REPLY Memorandum in SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to REMAND. (Hoff, Joseph) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 28, 2013 Filing 16 REQUEST for to Appear Telephonically by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. (Roshanian, Neda)
January 18, 2013 Filing 15 OPPOSITION by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. to #9 MOTION to REMAND. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration of G. Edward Anderson, PHD)(Mezias, Donna) Modified on 1/25/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 6, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joseph Steven Hoff on behalf of Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Attorney Hoff, Joseph Steven ADDED. (Hoff, Joseph) Modified on 12/7/2012 (Michel, G).
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to stipulation of counsel, the Motion to Remand, scheduled for December 17, 2012, is rescheduled for 2/4/13 at 9:00 a.m. The date the parties requested in the stipulation is not an available law and motion hearing date for Judge Burrell. The pretrial scheduling conference, currently set for 1/28/13, is rescheduled for 4/15/13 at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report shall be filed fourteen days prior to the hearing. re #12 Stipulation and Proposed Order Ordered by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/19/12. (Furstenau, S)
November 16, 2012 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Dates for Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Status Conference by John Brooks, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Mezias, Donna)
November 15, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Donna M Mezias on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Mezias, Donna M added. (Mezias, Donna)
November 5, 2012 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE re #4 Civil New Case Documents by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Jan, Gloria) Modified on 11/6/2012 (Michel, G).
November 5, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION to REMAND for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Motion Hearing SET for 12/17/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roshanian, Neda) Modified on 11/6/2012 (Michel, G).
November 2, 2012 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by John Brooks. (Mezias, Donna) Modified on 11/5/2012 (Michel, G).
October 30, 2012 Filing 7 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sandy Bell, Martin Gama. Attorney Roshanian, Neda added. (Roshanian, Neda)
October 18, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Plaintiffs. (Roshanian, Neda)
October 16, 2012 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Bertko, Liz Kathryn added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bertko, Liz)
October 5, 2012 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP Form) (Becknal, R)
October 5, 2012 RECEIPT number #CAE200047755 $350.00 fbo Bell et al v. Home Depot U.S.A by Gloria Jan on 10/5/2012. (Becknal, R)
October 4, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2012-00128281 by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila Douglas, #2 Declaration of Gloria C. Jan, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Jan, Gloria) Modified on 10/5/2012 (Becknal, R).
October 4, 2012 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Jan, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brooks
Represented By: Joel M. Cohn, PHV, PHV
Represented By: Gloria C Jan
Represented By: Liz Kathryn Bertko
Represented By: Donna M Mezias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Joel M. Cohn, PHV, PHV
Represented By: Gloria C Jan
Represented By: Liz Kathryn Bertko
Represented By: Donna M Mezias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Henry
Represented By: Melissa Grant
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Represented By: Arnab Banerjee
Represented By: Thomas Alistair Segal
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Gama
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Represented By: Arnab Banerjee
Represented By: Joseph Hoff
Represented By: Frank James Gatto
Represented By: Suzy E. Lee
Represented By: Melissa Grant
Represented By: Mark Yablonovich
Represented By: Glenn A. Danas
Represented By: Neda Roshanian
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Bell
Represented By: Chaim Shaun Setareh
Represented By: Arnab Banerjee
Represented By: Joseph Hoff
Represented By: Frank James Gatto
Represented By: Suzy E. Lee
Represented By: Melissa Grant
Represented By: Mark Yablonovich
Represented By: Glenn A. Danas
Represented By: Neda Roshanian
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?