Moulton v. United States
Plaintiff: Mary Moulton
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 2:2012cv02596
Filed: October 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402 Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MODIFIED STIPULATION and ORDER 27 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/22/2014 APPROVING compromise settlement and dismissing action with prejudice. (Zignago, K.) Modified on 5/28/2014 (Zignago, K.).
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/20/14 27 APPROVING Compromise Settlement and DISMISSING Action With Prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/1/14 ORDERING pursuant to the parties' request, a Settlement Conference is set for 5/16/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Settlement Conference Statements are due at least 7 days prior to the Settlement Conference. (Becknal, R)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/19/2014 ORDERING that the non-expert discovery cutoff is EXTENDED to 4/18/2014; initial expert disclosures EXTENDED to 5/2/2014; supplemental expert disclosures EXTENDED to 5/16/2014. (Zignago, K.)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER 15 for independent medical examination (neurological-psychological) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/8/2014. Plaintiff will submit to neurological-psychological independent medical examination on 1/27/2014 at 10:00 AM and 1/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in the Federal Courthouse / Attorney Lounge on the 1st Floor. Examination shall be perfomed by Dr. Robert Asarnow, Ph.D.. (Marciel, M)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER 11 for independent medical examination signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/9/2013. Parties stipulate that plaintiff will submit to a neurological independent medicalexamination on 9/12/2013 at 10:00 AM at 1635 Divisadero Street, Suite 520-530 in San Francisco, California, by Dr. Jill Ostrem, M.D.. (Marciel, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moulton v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Moulton
Represented By: Robert Loren Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?