Young v. Jefferies et al
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Young
Defendant: - Jefferies and Sandoval
Case Number: 2:2012cv02673
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/25/16 ordering this writ shall amend the writ issued on 3/24/16. The Custodian to produce Thomas D. Young on 5/24/16 at 9:00 a.m. in co urtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman via video conference. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: KJN & I.T. Dept, Sacramento)(3 certified copies of this writ sent to the Warden, CSP-Los Angeles County) (Plummer, M) Modified on 4/26/2016 (Plummer, M).
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/23/16 ordering the custodian to produce Thomas D. Young on 5/24/16 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Cus todian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD)(3 certified copies of this writ sent to the Warden, CSP-Lancaster) (Plummer, M)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/15/16 ORDERING that it is ordered that the deadline to submit a Joint Pretrial Statement is extended to May 10, 2016.(Dillon, M)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/11/16 ordering the parties shall file a joint pretrial statement within 60 days of the date of this order. The dates for a pretrial conference and a jury trial before a district judge will be set in the pretrial order. (Plummer, M)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/13/15 ordering the writ issued on 8/20/15 to provide plaintiff's appearance on 12/08/15 55 is vacated. The Custodian is ordere d to produce Thomas D. Young on 12/21/15 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD and KJN)(3 certified copies sent to the Warden, CSP-Los Angeles County)(Plummer, M) Modified on 11/13/2015 (Plummer, M).
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/19/15 ordering the Custodian to produce Thomas D. Young on 12/08/15 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Cu stodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: KJN and OTCD)( 3 certified copies of this writ sent to the Warden, CSP-Lancaster) (Plummer, M) Modified on 8/20/2015 (Plummer, M).
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/4/2015 ORDERING the parties to this action shall each, no later than 60 days from the date of this order, submit confidential settlement statements as described in this order. (cc: ADR) (Yin, K)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/21/15 ordering the parties to this action shall each, no later than 60 days from the date of this order, submit confidential statements as described below. The confidential statements shall n ot be served on the opposing party or filed with the court, but instead delivered by mail, fax, email or personal delivery to the court's Alternative Dispute Resolution division at the address, fax number or email address below and marked confidential. (See order for further details)(cc: ADR Director)(Plummer, M)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/07/15 ordering attorney James A. Clark is appointed in the above entitled matter. (See order for further details)(Plummer, M)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/28/15 ORDERING that defendant has complied with the 07/01/14 discovery order; plaintiff's 45 request to amend his discovery motion is GRANTED; plaintiff's amended motion to compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part: the request to compel production of the entirety of defendant's personnel records is DENIED; the request to compel production of information bearing on any allegations or discipline of defendant for e xcessive force is GRANTED; within 21 days, defendant shall either produce relevant documents, including documents from personnel files, concerning any complaints, investigations and disciplinary actions while defendant was employed by CDCR, for alleged conduct that is similar to that alleged in plaintiff's complaint (i.e., excessive force), or provide a properly verified response that no such records exist; the 24 02/04/14 order denying plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel is reconsidered and GRANTED, plaintiff's 22 request for the appointment of counsel is GRANTED. Case referred to Sujean Park, the courts pro bono coordinator (cc: Park) (Benson, A)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/15. The Clerk is directed to file the entire transcript of Plaintiff's deposition taken on 2/24/14, a copy of which was lodged on 4/8/14 and excerpts of which are contained in Defendant's Exhibit B, ECF No. 27-3; The FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 1/6/15 41 , are ADOPTED in full; and the Motion for Summary Judgment 27 is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/15/15 ordering defendant to respond to plaintiff's allegation that defendant has not complied with the court's discovery order. (See order for further details) (Plummer, M)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/05/15 recommending that the motion for summary judgment filed by Sandoval on 04/04/14 27 be denied. MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 27 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/10/14 DENYING 35 Motion for Reconsideration. (Manzer, C)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/4/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 22 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Requesting Confidential Settlement Statements for Prisoner Settlement Program signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/19/13 (see order for details). (cc ADRP)(Dillon, M)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Thomas D. Young signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/7/2013. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. The Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Jefferies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Jefferies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?