Carroll v. Diaz
Petitioner: James E. Carroll
Respondent: Diaz
Case Number: 2:2012cv02736
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/27/13 ORDERING that petitioners request for an evidentiary hearing, filed August 19, 2013 27 , is denied. It is RECOMMENDED that the petition be denied in its entirety; and the District Court decline to issue a certificate of appealability. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/2/2013 ORDERING that petitioner's 27 request for evidentiary hearing is DENIED without prejudice to the court's sua sponte reconsideration should the court conclude that an evidentiary hearing is necessary upon consideration of the merits of petitioner's claims. (Yin, K)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division of the United States District Court, Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 11/05/2012. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diaz
Represented By: Kari L. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James E. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?