Campos-Riedel v. JP Morgan Chase et al
Plaintiff: Sofia Campos-Riedel
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Quality Home Loan Services
Case Number: 2:2012cv02819
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/2/14 recommending that 45 Motion to Dismiss, 49 MOTION to DISMISS be granted and 45 Third Amended Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend; and further recommending that this action be closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Meuleman, A)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/1/14 ORDERING that within 14 days of the date of this order, Mr. Foondos shall SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why the undersigned should not issue an order granting the proposed substitution of atto rney substituting Mr. Foondos in as plaintiff's counsel of record in this action. Plaintiff Sofia Campos-Reidel shall file a statement advising the court as to whether she believes she is proceeding pro se or is currently represented by Mr. Foondos. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on Mr. Foondos at his address provided in the proposed substitution of attorney 62 . (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 10/2/2014 (Kastilahn, A).
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/28/14 ORDERING that Defendants' 1/13/14 motion to dismiss 38 is granted; Plaintiff's 12/12/13 second amended complaint 37 is dismissed; Plaintiff shall file a third amended comp laint on or before 3/21/14, that complies with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice; any amended complaint plaintiff elects to file must bear the docket number assigned to this case and must be lab eled "Third Amended Complaint;" failure to file an amended complaint in accordance with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed; and If any defendant named in plaintiff's original complaint, plaintiff&# 039;s first amended complaint or plaintiff's second amended complaint is named as a defendant in the third amended complaint plaintiff may elect to file, that defendant shall respond to the pleading within thirty days after it is filed and served. (Becknal, R)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/12/13 granting Motions to Dismiss 21 , 23 . Plaintiff's 03/12/13 amended complaint 20 is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amend ed complaint. If any defendant named in plaintiff's original complaint, is named as a defendant in the second amended complaint plaintiff may elect to file, that defendant shall respond to the pleading within 30 days after it is filed and served. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/19/13 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 13 Motion for Permission to File Pleadings Electronically. (Meuleman, A)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/22/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 10/16/2012 complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 3/15/2013. Defendants' 8 motion to dismiss, having been rendered moot, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos-Riedel v. JP Morgan Chase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Campos-Riedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Represented By: David Christopher Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: David Christopher Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Home Loan Services
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Hennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?