St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. Ace American Insurance Company, et al.
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company, NIC Insurance Company, Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Great American Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Financial Pacific Insurance Company, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, Lloyds of London, Hartford Insurance Company, Exact Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, AMCO Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Company, Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd., Everest National Insurance Company, American Zurich Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation, American Safety Claims Services, Valiant Insurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Inscorp, Ace American Insurance, Lexington Insurance Company, Century Surety Company, Assurance Company of America, Allied Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, American Safety Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, State National Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, American Home Assurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Old Republic Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company and Clarendon America Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv02820
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/3/15. (Kaminski, H)
March 31, 2015 Filing 312 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Everest Indemnity Insurance Company and Everest National Insurance Company and Thus the Entire Action by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/11/2015 ORDERING #310 that Defendant Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation is DISMISSED with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Reader, L) Modified on 3/12/2015 (Reader, L).
March 9, 2015 Filing 310 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(LaSalle, R.)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/30/15: Defendants NAVIGATORS only are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Kaminski, H)
January 23, 2015 Filing 308 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Navigators Insurance Company and Navigators Specialty Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/6/2015 DISMISSING Defendants Allied Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company, AMCO Insurance Company with prejudice; ORDERING each party to bear their own fees and costs. (Michel, G)
December 24, 2014 Filing 306 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Allied Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company and Amco Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/23/14 ORDERING that Defendants Assurance Company of America, Maryland Casualty Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Steadfast Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 17, 2014 Filing 304 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Assurance Company of America, Maryland Casualty Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Steadfast Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company separately and as successor to Valiant Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/11/14. Arch Specialty Insurance Company DISMISSED with prejudice. (Manzer, C)
December 8, 2014 Filing 302 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Aguilera, Abel)
November 20, 2014 Filing 301 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/18/2014 DISMISSING Defendants American Home Assurance Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1); ORDERING each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Michel, G)
November 19, 2014 Filing 300 DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL FOR SERVICE: Attorney Joel Andrew Morgan TERMINATED. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Hsu, Linda) Modified on 11/19/2014 (Michel, G).
November 18, 2014 Filing 299 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of Defendants American Home Assurance Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1) by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.) Modified on 11/19/2014 (Michel, G).
November 18, 2014 SERVICE BY MAIL: #297 Order, #298 Order, served on Joel Andrew Morgan. (Rivas, A)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on November 14, 2014. Defendants Ace American Insurance and Illinois Union Insurance Company only are DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees.(Rivas, A)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on November 14, 2014. Defendants Clarendon America Insurance Company and Praetorian Insurance Company only are DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Rivas, A)
November 12, 2014 Filing 296 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Clarendon America Insurance Company and Praetorian Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
November 12, 2014 Filing 295 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Ace American Insurance Company and Illinois Union Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/6/14 ORDERING the last day for the Court to hear dispositive motions shall be 3/12/2015. All other dates and deadlines set forth in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order #181 remain unchanged. (Kastilahn, A)
November 4, 2014 Filing 293 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Dispositive Motion Deadlines in the Pretrial Order by Ace American Insurance, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Astengo, David)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 292 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/30/2014 DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE paragraphs 89 and 199 of the #213 First Amended Complaint against Defendant Clarendon America Insurance Company; ORDERING each party to bear their own costs and fees related to paragraphs 89 and 199 of the #213 First Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
October 29, 2014 Filing 291 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Certain Allegations Only Against Defendant Clarendon America Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 STIPULATION and ORDER #289 for dismissal signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/2/2014. Defendant Interstate Fire & Casualty Company is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Marciel, M)
October 1, 2014 Filing 289 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by plaintiff St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company to dismiss defendant Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.) Modified on 10/3/2014 (Marciel, M)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/25/14 DISMISSING Old Republic Insurance Company. (Manzer, C)
August 21, 2014 Filing 287 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Old Republic Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
August 1, 2014 Filing 286 DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL FOR SERVICE by Everest National Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Company. Attorney Anet Medeli Castro TERMINATED. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Morgan, Joel) Modified on 8/4/2014 (Michel, G).
July 31, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by George D Yaron. (Yaron, George)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/9/14: Defendants Axis Surplus Insurance Company and Axis Specialty Insurance Company are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Kaminski, H)
June 9, 2014 Filing 283 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Axis Surplus Insurance Company and Axis Specialty Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/22/4: Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Kaminski, H)
May 22, 2014 Filing 281 [DISREGARD per atty request] REQUEST for Production of Documents propounded to St. Paul Mercury Insurnace Company, Set One by Clarendon America Insurance Company. Attorney De La Pena, Gregory R. added. (De La Pena, Gregory) Modified on 5/22/2014 (Kaminski, H).
May 20, 2014 Filing 280 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for dimissal of defendant First Mercury Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(LaSalle, R.)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/29/2014 DISMISSING Defendant Exact Property and Casualty Insurance Company with prejudice; ORDERING each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Michel, G)
April 28, 2014 Filing 278 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Dismiss Defendant Exact Property and Casualty Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(LaSalle, R.) Modified on 4/29/2014 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/10/14 ORDERING that defendant Financial Pacific Insurance Company is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/10/14 ORDERING that Defendant Century Surety Company is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 10, 2014 Filing 275 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL for SERVICE. Attorney Lindsey Anne Morgan added for Assurance Company of America, Maryland Casualty Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Steadfast Insurance Company, Valiant Insurance Company, and Zurich American Insurance Company; attorney Quyen Thi Le is terminated (Morgan, Lindsey) Modified on 4/11/2014 (Marciel, M)
April 10, 2014 Filing 274 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of defendant Financial Pacific Insurance Company only by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.)
April 10, 2014 Filing 273 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of defendant Century Surety Company Only by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.)
March 6, 2014 Filing 272 REQUEST to be Removed from the Court's Service List by Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company. (Hutchinson, A.) Modified on 3/6/2014 (Krueger, M).
March 5, 2014 Filing 271 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Trelawney James Kitchen terminated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Morgan, Joel)
February 11, 2014 Filing 270 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Sullivan, Jesse) Modified on 2/12/2014 (Kaminski, H).
January 2, 2014 Filing 269 ANSWER to #213 First Amended Complaint by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Astengo, David) Modified on 1/3/2014 (Michel, G).
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/19/13: Paragraphs 55 and 165 only of ST. PAULs First Amended Complaint against defendant AMCO may be dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Kaminski, H)
December 16, 2013 Filing 267 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Exact Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney Phelps, Benjamin A. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Phelps, Benjamin)
December 11, 2013 Filing 266 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Certain Claims Only Against Defendant AMCO Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
December 9, 2013 Filing 265 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Illinois Union Insurance Company.(Astengo, David)
December 9, 2013 Filing 264 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Ace American Insurance.(Astengo, David)
November 25, 2013 Filing 263 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Clarendon America Insurance Company. (Yaron, George)
November 25, 2013 Filing 262 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (Yaron, George)
November 22, 2013 Filing 261 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Old Republic Insurance Company.(Morrow, David)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/20/2013 DISMISSING, without prejudice, Defendant Valiant Insurance Company only pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1). (Michel, G)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/20/2013 DISMISSING, without prejudice, Defendant Assurance Company of America as to paragraphs 79 and 189 of the #213 First Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/20/2013 DISMISSING, without prejudice, Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company as to paragraphs 149 and 248 only of the #213 First Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/20/2013 DISMISSING, without prejudice, Defendant Maryland Casualty Company as to paragraphs 148 and 247 only of the #213 First Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/20/2013 DISMISSING, without prejudice, Defendant Northern Insurance Company of New York as to paragraphs 153 and 252 only of the #213 First Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
November 20, 2013 Filing 255 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company to dismiss defendant Valiant Insurance Company only. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.) Modified on 11/21/2013 (Marciel, M)
November 20, 2013 Filing 254 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company to dismiss certain allegations only against defendant Assurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.) Modified on 11/21/2013 (Marciel, M)
November 20, 2013 Filing 253 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company to dismiss certain allegations only against defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.) Modified on 11/21/2013 (Marciel, M)
November 20, 2013 Filing 252 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company to dismiss certain allegations only against defendant Maryland Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.) Modified on 11/21/2013 (Marciel, M)
November 20, 2013 Filing 251 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company to dismiss certain allegations only against defendant Northern Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (LaSalle, R.) Modified on 11/21/2013 (Marciel, M)
November 19, 2013 Filing 250 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by American Home Assurance Company.(Strout, Nancy)
November 19, 2013 Filing 249 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by National Union Fire Insurance Company.(Strout, Nancy)
November 19, 2013 Filing 248 [DISREGARD] ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Lexington Insurance Company.(Strout, Nancy) Modified on 11/19/2013 (Meuleman, A). Modified on 11/19/2013 (Becknal, R). SEE #246
November 19, 2013 Filing 247 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Chartis Specialty Insurance Company.(Strout, Nancy)
November 19, 2013 Filing 246 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Lexington Insurance Company.(Strout, Nancy) Modified on 11/19/2013 (Meuleman, A).
November 19, 2013 Filing 245 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Exact Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 11/7/2013. (LaSalle, R.) Modified on 11/19/2013 (Meuleman, A).
November 14, 2013 Filing 244 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ace American Insurance, Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Astengo, David) Modified on 11/15/2013 (Kaminski, H).
November 13, 2013 Filing 243 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Financial Pacific Insurance Company.(Yaron, George)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 STIPULATION and ORDER #236 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/12/13 ORDERING that paragraphs 82 and 192 only of ST. PAUL's First Amended Complaint against defendant CENTURY are DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Kastilahn, A)
November 13, 2013 Filing 241 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Clarendon America Insurance Company.(Yaron, George)
November 12, 2013 Filing 240 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Clarendon America Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company.(O'Sullivan, Whitney)
November 12, 2013 Filing 239 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company.(Sullivan, Jesse)
November 12, 2013 Filing 238 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by AMCO Insurance Company.(Wisniewski, Ashley)
November 12, 2013 Filing 237 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Morrow, David)
November 12, 2013 Filing 236 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Certain Claims Only Against Defendant Century Surety Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
November 12, 2013 Filing 235 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by First Mercury Insurance Company.(Aharonian, Alejandro)
November 12, 2013 Filing 234 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Navigators Insurance Company.(Lindell, Timothy)
November 12, 2013 Filing 233 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Valiant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company.(Le, Quyen)
November 12, 2013 Filing 232 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Le, Quyen)
November 12, 2013 Filing 231 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Le, Quyen)
November 12, 2013 Filing 230 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Northern Insurance Company of New York.(Le, Quyen)
November 12, 2013 Filing 229 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Maryland Casualty Company.(Le, Quyen)
November 12, 2013 Filing 228 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by American Zurich Insurance Company. Attorney Le, Quyen Thi added. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Le, Quyen) Modified on 11/12/2013 (Kaminski, H).
November 12, 2013 Filing 227 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Assurance Company of America.(Le, Quyen)
November 8, 2013 Filing 226 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Attorney Horowitz, Jamie Blaire added.(Horowitz, Jamie)
November 8, 2013 Filing 225 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #213 First Amended Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company; DEMAND for Jury Trial. (Newman, Gregory) Modified on 11/8/2013 (Marciel, M)
November 8, 2013 Filing 224 [DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - REFER TO #225 DOCUMENT AS ORIGINAL]ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Newman, Gregory) Modified on 11/8/2013 (Marciel, M)
November 6, 2013 Filing 223 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Benjamin A. Phelps for Farmers Insurance Company, attorney Andrew C. Johnson and Steven Saeyoung Son terminated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Phelps, Benjamin)
November 6, 2013 Filing 222 ANSWER to #213 Amended Complaint, by Century Surety Company.(Darling-Alderton, Lisa)
November 5, 2013 Filing 221 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Exact Property and Casualty Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kari Marie Myron* *650 Town Center* *Suite 100* *Costa Mesa, CA 92626*. (Manzer, C)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/31/2013 ORDERING that paragraphs 67, 69-74, 77, 177, 179-184 and 187 only of St. Paul's First Amended Complaint against defendant Arch are DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Zignago, K.)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/30/2013 ORDERING that paragraphs 100, 101, 103, 210, 211 and 213 only of St. Paul's First Amended Complaint against defendant First Mercury are DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Zignago, K.)
October 31, 2013 Filing 218 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Certain Claims Only Against Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
October 29, 2013 Filing 217 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Certain Claims Only Against Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
October 29, 2013 Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/29/2013: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal #215 and FRCP 41(a)(1), Defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (erroneously sued as Hartford Insurance Company), and Hartford Fire Insurance Company ONLY, are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Each party to bear their own costs and fees. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
October 29, 2013 Filing 215 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Hartford Fire Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
October 28, 2013 Filing 214 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *American Zurich Insurance Company, Exact Property Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Abel Eric Aguilera* *650 Town Center Drive* *Suite 100* *Costa Mesa, CA 92626*. (Manzer, C)
October 25, 2013 Filing 213 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Exact Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attn Clerk please issue summons as to newly added party), #2 Summons as to American Zurich Insurance Company (Attn clerk please issue summons as to newly added party), #3 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #191 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/18/13. (Kaminski, H)
October 11, 2013 Filing 211 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/11/2013: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint #191 is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 10/17/2013 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
October 10, 2013 Filing 210 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 209 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Jesse Matthew Sullivan. (Sullivan, Jesse)
October 3, 2013 Filing 208 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Clarendon America Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (O'Sullivan, Whitney)
October 3, 2013 Filing 207 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Navigators Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (Lindell, Timothy)
October 3, 2013 Filing 206 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Everest Indemnity Company, Everest National Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (Kitchen, Trelawney)
October 3, 2013 Filing 205 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (Ward, Scott)
October 3, 2013 Filing 204 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by First Mercury Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (Aharonian, Alejandro)
October 3, 2013 Filing 203 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by AMCO Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (Wisniewski, Ashley)
October 3, 2013 Filing 202 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Arch Specialty Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (Newman, Gregory)
October 3, 2013 Filing 201 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Assurance Company of America, Maryland Casualty Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Steadfast Insurance Company, Valiant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company to #191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint. (Curet, Blaise)
October 2, 2013 Filing 200 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Henry Ming-Cheng Su on behalf of Financial Pacific Insurance Company. Attorney Su, Henry Ming-Cheng added. (Su, Henry)
October 2, 2013 Filing 199 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by D. David Steele on behalf of Financial Pacific Insurance Company. Attorney Steele, D. David added. (Steele, D.)
September 18, 2013 Filing 198 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/18/2013: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss #197 and FRCP 41(a)(1), Defendant Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company ONLY, is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs and fess. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 18, 2013 Filing 197 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Pennsylvania General Insurance Company by its Transferee OneBeacon Insurance Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
September 18, 2013 Filing 196 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND REQUEST to be removed from service list by American Safety Indemnity Company. (Swerdlow, Alan) Modified on 9/18/2013 (Kaminski, H).
September 18, 2013 Filing 195 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/18/2013: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance #194 , and with good cause having been shown, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Accordinly, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file a first amended complaint #191 is CONTINUED 10/17/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 17, 2013 Filing 194 MOTION to CONTINUE #191 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.) Modified on 9/18/2013 (Kaminski, H).
August 30, 2013 Filing 193 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtrooom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/30/2013: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss #192 and FRCP 41(a)(1), Defendant American Safety Indemnity Company, for itself and erroneously named as American Safety Insurance Company and American Safety Claims Servics, ONLY is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs and fess. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 29, 2013 Filing 192 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant American Safety by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.) Modified on 9/9/2013 (Zignago, K.).
August 28, 2013 Filing 191 MOTION to AMEND the #2 Complaint by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott La Salle, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.) Modified on 8/29/2013 (Zignago, K.).
August 26, 2013 Filing 190 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Andrew C. Johnson for Farmers Insurance Company. (Johnson, Andrew)
August 21, 2013 Filing 189 NOTICE of designation of counsel by First Mercury Insurance Company. (Kalvestran, Jennifer) Modified on 8/22/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 16, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alejandro Hugo Aharonian on behalf of First Mercury Insurance Company. Attorney Aharonian, Alejandro Hugo added. (Aharonian, Alejandro)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/15/2013 ORDERING that the time for Farmers Insurance Company to respond to the complaint is HEREBY EXTENDED to 8/30/2013. (Donati, J)
August 14, 2013 Filing 186 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time To Respond To Initial Complaint re #2 Complaint by Farmers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time)(Son, Steven)
August 14, 2013 Filing 185 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Steven Saeyoung Son for Farmers Insurance Company. (Son, Steven)
August 13, 2013 Filing 184 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Stephen Lamar Cope on behalf of First Mercury Insurance Company. Attorney Cope, Stephen Lamar added. (Cope, Stephen)
August 1, 2013 Filing 183 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/1/2013: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss #180 and FRCP 41(a)(1), Defendant Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company ONLY is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs and fess. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
August 1, 2013 Filing 182 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jenna Eve Settino on behalf of Financial Pacific Insurance Company. Attorney Settino, Jenna Eve added. (Settino, Jenna)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/31/2013 ORDERING that discovery be completed by 6/27/2014; ORDERING that all counsel designate experts, in writing, by 9/26/2014; ORDERING that all counsel designate supplemental experts within 20 days of expert witness designation; ORDERING that all dispositive motions be heard by 1/29/2015; ORDERING that any dispositive motions be filed 8 weeks prior to the hearing; ORDERING that the oppositions and cross-motions be filed 5 weeks prior to the hearing; ORDERING that the replies and oppositions to the cross-motions be filed 3 weeks prior to the hearing; ORDERING that the replies to the cross-motions be filed 1 week prior to the hearing; SETTING a Final Pretrial Conference for 5/7/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; ORDERING that the parties file a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement by 4/9/2015; ORDERING that the parties file trial briefs by 4/23/2015; ORDERING that any evidentiary or procedural motions be filed by 4/16/2015; ORDERING that the oppositions be filed by 4/23/2015; ORDERING that any replies be filed by 4/30/2015; SETTING a Jury Trial for 7/13/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; ORDERING that any objections be filed within 7 days. (Michel, G)
August 1, 2013 Filing 180 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order. #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.) Modified on 8/2/2013 (Kaminski, H).
July 29, 2013 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Hartford Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney Ward, Scott Patrick added. (Ward, Scott)
July 26, 2013 Filing 178 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Century Surety Company. (Darling-Alderton, Lisa)
July 26, 2013 Filing 177 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.) Modified on 7/30/2013 (Becknal, R).
July 26, 2013 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company. (Elowsky, Jennifer)
July 26, 2013 Filing 175 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by American Home Assurance Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company. (Selvin, Gary)
July 18, 2013 Filing 174 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company. (Campo, John)
July 18, 2013 Filing 173 JOINT STATUS REPORT by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
July 12, 2013 Filing 172 Defendants' CERTIFICATION of Interested entities or parties. (O'Sullivan, Whitney) Modified on 7/15/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 12, 2013 Filing 171 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Clarendon America Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company. Attorney O'Sullivan, Whitney Fiske added.(O'Sullivan, Whitney)
July 10, 2013 Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/10/2013: The Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2013 was VACATED per the Court's Minute Order 158 issued on 4/11/2013. Accordingly, Defendants' Request to Appear Telephoncially #169 is DENIED as MOOT. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
July 10, 2013 Filing 169 Defendants' REQUEST for Telephonic Appearance at Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Ward, Scott) Modified on 7/11/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/5/13: Defendant UNDERWRITERS only is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. (Kaminski, H)
July 2, 2013 Filing 167 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Dismiss Certain Underwriters, erroneously sued as Lloyd's of London by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.) Modified on 7/3/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
June 20, 2013 Filing 166 ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney John R. Campo for Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Campo, John)
May 20, 2013 Filing 165 ANSWER to CROSSCLAIM of Ace American Insurance Company by American Home Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Strout, Nancy)
April 25, 2013 Filing 164 Certification of Interested Parties Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Defendant AMCO Insurance Company. (Wisniewski, Ashley) Modified on 4/26/2013 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 17, 2013 Filing 163 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by AMCO Insurance Company. Attorney Blaine, Timothy M. added.(Blaine, Timothy)
April 16, 2013 Filing 162 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company.(Yoon, Hee Sung)
April 16, 2013 Filing 161 STIPULATION to File Amended Answer to #2 Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Yoon, Hee Sung) Modified on 4/16/2013 (Meuleman, A).
April 15, 2013 Filing 160 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Scott Patrick Ward on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company. Attorney Ward, Scott Patrick added. (Ward, Scott)
April 12, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties by Clarendon America Insurance Company, Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (Yaron, George) Modified on 4/15/2013 (Meuleman, A).
April 11, 2013 Filing 158 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/11/2013: Pursuant to the Order of Reassignment #151 , the Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2013 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is hereby VACATED. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report no later than 7/18/2013. Plaintiff shall serve defendants, not yet appearing, with a copy of this Minute Order. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Schultz, C)
April 9, 2013 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company. Attorney Morales, Ramiro ADDED. (Morales, Ramiro) Modified on 4/10/2013 (Michel, G).
April 9, 2013 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cross Claimant Ace American Insurance. Attorney Morales, Ramiro ADDED. (Morales, Ramiro) Modified on 4/10/2013 (Michel, G).
April 5, 2013 Filing 155 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Illinois Union Insurance Company. Attorney Astengo, David A. ADDED. (Astengo, David) Modified on 4/8/2013 (Michel, G).
April 5, 2013 Filing 154 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against American Home Assurance Company by Ace American Insurance. Attorney Astengo, David A. ADDED. (Astengo, David) Modified on 4/8/2013 (Michel, G).
April 4, 2013 Filing 153 NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties by Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company. (Elowsky, Jennifer)
April 4, 2013 Filing 152 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company. Attorney Elowsky, Jennifer Lynn added.(Elowsky, Jennifer)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Troy L. Nunley* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned from District Judge *Kimberly J. Mueller* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
March 28, 2013 Filing 150 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/28/2013: Defendant AMCO Insurance Company's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file an answer to the complaint #123 is granted. AMCO's answer is due within twenty-one days of the date of this order. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
March 28, 2013 Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/28/2013: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation re: voluntary dismissal #146 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to defendant Catalina London LTD, incorrectly sued as Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
March 28, 2013 Filing 148 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/28/2013: Pursuant to plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss #147 and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Defendant Inscorp is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
March 27, 2013 Filing 147 MOTION to DISMISS by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of service)(LaSalle, R.)
March 27, 2013 Filing 146 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Catalina London, LTD by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Dismiss Catalina London, LTD)(LaSalle, R.)
March 26, 2013 Filing 145 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by R. Scott LaSalle on behalf of St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
March 25, 2013 Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint #123 is SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of 3/29/2013 is VACATED and the pending requests for telephonic appearance #133 and #136 are DENIED as MOOT. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
March 22, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Blaise Stephen Curet. Attorney Curet, Blaise Stephen added. (Curet, Blaise)
March 22, 2013 Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/22/2013: Pursuant to the Stipulation to Dismiss #141 and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), Defendant Lumbermans Mutual Casualty Company is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Accordingly, all deadlines and hearings as to this Defendant ONLY, including Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #126 , are VACATED. The pending requests to appear telephonically #134 and #137 are DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry) (Krueger, M)
March 22, 2013 Filing 141 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL as to Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
March 22, 2013 Filing 140 STIPULATION to Dismiss Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Service)(LaSalle, R.)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: Due to the recalled appointment of Magistrate Judge * Gregory G. Hollows* to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney* for all further proceedings. (Waggoner, D)
March 11, 2013 Filing 138 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company to #123 MOTION for extension of time. Attorney LaSalle, R. Scott added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(LaSalle, R.) Modified on 3/12/2013 (Kaminski, H).
March 11, 2013 Filing 137 REQUEST and PROPOSED ORDER for Permission to Appear Telephonically at #126 Motion to Dismiss by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Sullivan, Jesse) Modified on 3/11/2013 (Kaminski, H).
March 11, 2013 Filing 136 REQUEST and PROPOSED ORDER for Permission to Appear Telephonically at #123 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Complaint by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Sullivan, Jesse) Modified on 3/11/2013 (Kaminski, H).
March 8, 2013 Filing 135 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Financial Pacific Insurance Company. Attorney Yaron, George D added.(Yaron, George)
March 7, 2013 Filing 134 REQUEST for Permission to Appear Telephonically at the 4-12-13 Hearing by Everest Indemnity Company, Everest National Insurance Company. (Castro, Anet) Modified on 3/8/2013 (Meuleman, A).
March 7, 2013 Filing 133 REQUEST for Permission to Appear Telephonically at the 3-29-13 Hearing by Everest Indemnity Company, Everest National Insurance Company. Attorney Castro, Anet Medeli added. (Castro, Anet) Modified on 3/8/2013 (Meuleman, A).
March 5, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Eli, Daniel)
March 5, 2013 Filing 131 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Eli on behalf of St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Eli, Daniel)
March 1, 2013 Filing 130 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hee Sung Yoon on behalf of Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Yoon, Hee Sung added. (Yoon, Hee Sung)
March 1, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven Blake Bitter on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company. Attorney Bitter, Steven Blake added. (Bitter, Steven)
March 1, 2013 Filing 128 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel Kimberly D. Howatt by Navigators Insurance Company. (Lindell, Timothy)
February 28, 2013 Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/28/2013: In light of the pending Motion for Extension of Time #123 and the pending Motion to Dismiss #126 , the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 4/18/2013 is VACATED and RESET for 7/25/2013 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. No later than 7/18/213, the parties shall file a joint status report. Plaintiff shall notify defendants, not yet appearing, of this minute order. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 27, 2013 Filing 126 MOTION to DISMISS by Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company. Attorney Skane, Elizabeth A. added. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order . Skane, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/28/2013 (Kaminski, H).
February 27, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE of HEARING on MOTION #123 MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER to Complaint : Motion Hearing SET for 3/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kastilahn, A)
February 25, 2013 Filing 124 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Trelawney James Kitchen for Everest Indemnity Company,Trelawney James Kitchen for Everest National Insurance Company, attorney Mark Eric Inbody terminated (Kitchen, Trelawney)
February 21, 2013 Filing 123 MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER to Complaint by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Timothy M. Blaine, #3 Declaration of Ashley M. Wisniewski, #4 Proposed Order)(Wisniewski, Ashley)
February 14, 2013 Filing 122 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by American Home Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Selvin, Gary)
February 14, 2013 Filing 121 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Chartis Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Selvin, Gary)
February 14, 2013 Filing 120 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Selvin, Gary)
February 14, 2013 Filing 119 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by National Union Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Selvin, Gary)
February 11, 2013 Filing 118 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company. Attorney Feeley, John added. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, #2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hartford Fire Insurance Company)(Feeley, John)
February 11, 2013 Filing 117 STATEMENT of Disclosure of AXIS Surplus Insurance Company by Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Dunham, Tamiko)
February 11, 2013 Filing 116 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Axis Surplus Insurance Company.(Dunham, Tamiko)
February 4, 2013 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd. re #112 Answer to Complaint. (Freeman, Gwen)
February 4, 2013 Filing 114 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd. re #112 Answer to Complaint. (Freeman, Gwen) Modified on 2/5/2013 (Reader, L).
February 4, 2013 Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/4/2013: The parties' stipulated request to extend time to respond to complaint #101 is DENIED, as defendants' initial time to respond has passed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b), 12(a); Local Rule 144. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
February 4, 2013 Filing 112 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd..(Freeman, Gwen)
February 1, 2013 Filing 111 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Corporate Disclosure)(Morrow, David)
February 1, 2013 Filing 110 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Timothy Paul Lindell on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company. Attorney Lindell, Timothy Paul added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lindell, Timothy)
February 1, 2013 Filing 109 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/1/2013 GRANTING the parties' stipulated request for extension of time #106 . Accordingly, the deadline for defendant AXIS, to respond to the complaint is EXTENDED to 2/11/2013. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 31, 2013 Filing 108 STATEMENT of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure by Defendant First Mercury Insurance Company. (Kalvestran, Jennifer)
January 31, 2013 Filing 107 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by First Mercury Insurance Company.(Kalvestran, Jennifer)
January 31, 2013 Filing 106 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (FRCP 6; Local Rule 144) by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Dunham, Tamiko)
January 30, 2013 Filing 105 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Navigators Insurance Company. Attorney Howatt, Kimberly Diane added. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Proof of Service) (Howatt, Kimberly) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Marciel, M)
January 30, 2013 Filing 104 ANSWER by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company; DEMAND for Jury Trial. (Sullivan, Jesse) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Marciel, M)
January 30, 2013 Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant Everest National Insurance Company. (Hsu, Linda) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Marciel, M)
January 30, 2013 Filing 102 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant Everest Indemnity Company. (Hsu, Linda) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Marciel, M)
January 30, 2013 Filing 101 STIPULATION extending time to respond to plaintiff's #2 Complaint by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. Attorney Sullivan, Jesse Matthew added. (Sullivan, Jesse) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Marciel, M)
January 30, 2013 Filing 100 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company and Everest Natioal Insurance Company. Attorney Hsu, Linda Wendell added. (Hsu, Linda) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Marciel, M)
January 30, 2013 Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/30/2013: Plaintiff's request for a second extension of time for Hartford Defendants to respond to the complaint #98 is GRANTED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 29, 2013 Filing 98 AMENDED #96 STIPULATION granting Hartford defendants a Second Extension of Time to respond to Complaint (LR 143 & 144) by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Aguilera, Abel) Modified on 1/30/2013 (Marciel, M)
January 29, 2013 Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER: [Text Only] issued by courtroom deputy D. Eichhorn for Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows: The STATUS (Pretrial Scheduling) CONFERENCE set for 04/11/2013 at 1:30 PM before Judge Hollows is VACATED and RESET for 4/18/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. No later than 04/11/13, the parties shall file with Judge Mueller a joint status report. Plaintiff shall notify defendants, not yet appearing, of the new dates/deadlines. (Eichhorn, D)
January 28, 2013 Filing 96 (DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED DOCUMENT #98 ) STIPULATION granting Hartford defendants a second Extension of Time to respond to Complaint by St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company. [not signed by either party] (Eli, Daniel) Modified on 1/29/2013 (Marciel, M) Modified on 1/29/2013 (Schultz, C).
January 28, 2013 Filing 95 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Clarendon America Insurance Company. Attorney Yaron, George D added. (Yaron, George)
January 28, 2013 Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/28/2013: The parties' stipulated request to extend time to respond to complaint #90 is DENIED, as defendants' initial time to respond has passed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b), 12(a); Local Rule 144. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 28, 2013 Filing 93 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/28/2013: The parties' amended request #89 is DENIED. As defendants' initial time to respond has passed, the court may only issue an extension if there is good cause and excusable neglect. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(B). (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 25, 2013 Filing 92 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. (Blais, Michele)
January 25, 2013 Filing 91 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Lisa Darling-Alderton for Century Surety Company (Darling-Alderton, Lisa)
January 24, 2013 Filing 90 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Extend Time To Answer Complaint by AMCO Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company. Attorney Wisniewski, Ashley M. added. (Wisniewski, Ashley)
January 24, 2013 Filing 89 AMENDED DOCUMENT by American Home Assurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company: Amended #82 Stipulation and Proposed Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(Strout, Nancy)
January 24, 2013 Filing 88 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Michelle L. Carder,David M. Morrow for Old Republic Insurance Company (McMillen, Joseph)
January 23, 2013 Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/23/2013 GRANTING the parties' stipulated request for extension of time #86 . Accordingly, the deadline for defendant Catalina Holdings, to respond to the complaint is EXTENDED to 2/4/2013. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
January 23, 2013 Filing 86 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of the Deadline for Defendant Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd. to Respond to the Complaint by Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd.. (Freeman, Gwen)
January 23, 2013 Filing 85 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. (Strout, Nancy)
January 23, 2013 Filing 84 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gwen Freeman on behalf of Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd.. Attorney Freeman, Gwen added. (Freeman, Gwen)
January 22, 2013 Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/22/2013: The parties' stipulated request to extend time to respond to complaint #82 is DENIED, as defendants' initial time to respond has passed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b), 12(a); Local Rule 144. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 22, 2013 Filing 82 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by American Home Assurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company. Attorney Strout, Nancy Jean added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Strout, Nancy)
January 18, 2013 Filing 81 STATEMENT of Disclosure {Fed.R.Civ.Proc. 7.1] by Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company re #80 Answer to Complaint. (Newman, Gregory)
January 18, 2013 Filing 80 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Newman, Gregory Jacob added.(Newman, Gregory)
January 18, 2013 Filing 79 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd. served on 12/24/2012. (Eli, Daniel) Modified on 1/22/2013 (Meuleman, A).
January 18, 2013 Filing 78 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Clarendon America Insurance Company served on 12/24/2012. (Eli, Daniel) Modified on 1/22/2013 (Meuleman, A).
January 16, 2013 Filing 77 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Dana La Rhea Leier Stenvick for First Mercury Insurance Company (Stenvick, Dana)
January 16, 2013 Filing 76 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Jennifer Corrine Kalvestran for First Mercury Insurance Company, attorney William Arthur Bossen terminated (Kalvestran, Jennifer)
January 16, 2013 Filing 75 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/16/2013 ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 3/21/2013 before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED and RESET for 4/11/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. No later than 4/4/2013, the parties shall file with Judge Hollows a joint status report. Plaintiff shall notify defendants, not yet appearing, of the new dates/deadlines. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
January 15, 2013 Filing 74 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Valiant Insurance Company. (Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 73 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Valiant Insurance Company.(Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 72 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 71 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 70 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 69 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Steadfast Insurance Company.(Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 68 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Northern Insurance Company of New York. (Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 67 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Northern Insurance Company of New York.(Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 66 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Maryland Casualty Company. (Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 65 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Maryland Casualty Company.(Le, Quyen)
January 15, 2013 Filing 64 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Defendant Assurance Company of America. (Curet, Blaise)
January 15, 2013 Filing 63 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Assurance Company of America. Attorney Curet, Blaise Stephen added.(Curet, Blaise)
January 11, 2013 Filing 62 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record Certification of Interested Entities or Persons)(Blais, Michele)
January 11, 2013 Filing 61 JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants Everest Indemnity Co. and Everest National Ins. Co. to File A Responsive Pleading to Complaint by Everest Indemnity Company, Everest National Insurance Company. Attorney Inbody, Mark Eric added. (Inbody, Mark) Modified on 1/16/2013 (Reader, L).
January 10, 2013 Filing 60 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company served on 12/19/2012, answer due 1/9/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 7, 2013 Filing 59 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: American Home Assurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 7, 2013 Filing 58 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Old Republic Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 7, 2013 Filing 57 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Century Surety Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 7, 2013 Filing 56 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Axis Surplus Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 7, 2013 Filing 55 STIPULATION to Extend Time to 1/31/13 to Respond to Complaint. Attorney Selvin, Gary Robert added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Selvin, Gary) Modified on 1/11/2013 (Becknal, R).
January 4, 2013 Filing 54 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation. Attorney Goldscher, Stacy Ruth added.(Goldscher, Stacy)
January 4, 2013 Filing 53 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: American Safety Indemnity Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 4, 2013 Filing 52 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: American Safety Claims Services served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 4, 2013 Filing 51 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: American Safety Insurance Company served on 12/18/2012, answer due 1/8/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 4, 2013 Filing 50 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: State National Insurance Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 4, 2013 Filing 49 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ace American Insurance served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 4, 2013 Filing 48 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Financial Pacific Insurance Company served on 12/19/2012, answer due 1/9/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
January 3, 2013 Filing 47 STIPULATION re #2 Complaint To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by First Mercury Insurance Company. Attorney Bossen, William Arthur added. (Bossen, William)
January 3, 2013 Filing 46 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by Old Republic Insurance Company. Attorney McMillen, Joseph Stephen added. (McMillen, Joseph)
January 2, 2013 Filing 45 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Blais, Michele O. added. (Blais, Michele)
January 2, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement by Century Surety Company. (Peer, John)
January 2, 2013 Filing 43 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Century Surety Company. Attorney Peer, John E. added.(Peer, John)
January 2, 2013 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/2/2013 GRANTING the parties' joint request for extension of time #41 . Accordingly, the deadline by which defendants Assurance Company of America, Maryland Casualty Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Steadfast Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company as successor, and Zurich American Insurance Company shall respond to plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to 1/17/2013. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 28, 2012 Filing 41 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Assurance Company of America, Maryland Casualty Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Steadfast Insurance Company, Valiant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Le, Quyen Thi added. (Le, Quyen)
December 28, 2012 Filing 40 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Attorney Dunham, Tamiko Alicia-Malia added. (Dunham, Tamiko)
December 27, 2012 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Farmers Insurance Company served on 12/24/2012, answer due 1/14/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Everest National Insurance Company served on 12/17/2012, answer due 1/7/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Everest Indemnity Company served on 12/27/2012, answer due 1/17/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Zurich American Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Steadfast Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Northern Insurance Company of New York served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: NIC Insurance Company served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Navigators Insurance Company served on 12/13/2012, answer due 1/3/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: National Union Fire Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Maryland Casualty Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 28 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by American Safety Indemnity Company. Attorney Swerdlow, Alan E. added.(Swerdlow, Alan)
December 27, 2012 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lexington Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 26 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Hartford Insurance Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: First Mercury Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Chartis Specialty Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Assurance Company of America served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 27, 2012 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company served on 12/14/2012, answer due 1/4/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 26, 2012 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Praetorian Insurance Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 26, 2012 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Nationwide Insurance Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 26, 2012 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 26, 2012 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Illinois Union Insurance Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 26, 2012 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 26, 2012 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Arch Specialty Insurance Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 26, 2012 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: AMCO Insurance Company served on 12/12/2012, answer due 1/2/2013. (Eli, Daniel)
December 21, 2012 Filing 13 STIPULATION Granting Hartford Casualty Insurance Company an Extension to Answer Complaint by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cert of Service)(Aguilera, Abel)
December 21, 2012 Filing 12 STIPULATION Granting Hartford Defendants an Extension of time to Respond to Complaint by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cert of Svc)(Aguilera, Abel)
December 18, 2012 Filing 11 STIPULATION to extend time to Respond to #1 Complaint by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Eli, Daniel) Modified on 12/19/2012 (Matson, R).
December 14, 2012 Filing 10 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to *AMCO Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, American Safety Claims Services, American Safety Indemnity Company, American Safety Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Assurance Company of America, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd., Century Surety Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Clarendon America Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Financial Pacific Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Inscorp, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Lloyds of London, Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company, Maryland Casualty Company, NIC Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Old Republic Insurance Company, Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, State National Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Valiant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Karie Marie Myron* *650 Town Center Drive* *Suite 100* *Costa Mesa, Ca 92626*. (Manzer, C)
December 13, 2012 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz on 12/13/2012: Pursuant to plaintiff's request for dismissal #8 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(I), this action is DISMISSED without prejudice as to Great American Insurance Company only. Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
December 13, 2012 PARTY UPDATE: Great American Insurance Company terminated. (Manzer, C)
December 12, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Eli, Daniel)
December 10, 2012 Filing 7 (DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED DOCUMENT #8 ) NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Attorney Eli, Daniel added. (Eli, Daniel) Modified on 12/13/2012 (Schultz, C).
November 19, 2012 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP Form) (Manzer, C)
November 19, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *AMCO Insurance Company, Ace American Insurance Company, Allied Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company, American Safety Claims Services, American Safety Indemnity Company, American Safety Insurance Company, Arch Specialty Insurance Company, Assurance Company of America, Axis Surplus Insurance Company, Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd., Century Surety Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Clarendon America Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Farmers Insurance Company, Financial Pacific Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation, Great American Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Inscorp, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Lloyds of London, Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company, Maryland Casualty Company, NIC Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company, Northern Insurance Company of New York, Old Republic Insurance Company, Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company, Praetorian Insurance Company, Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG, State National Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Valiant Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kari Marie Myron* *650 Town Center* *Suite 100* *Costa Mesa, Ca 92626*. (Manzer, C)
November 16, 2012 RECEIPT number #CAE200048690 $350.00 fbo St. Paul Mercury Insurance Co. by The Aguilera Law Group on 11/16/2012. (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Certification of Interested Parties by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company re #2 Complaint. (Myron, Kari)
November 16, 2012 Filing 3 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. (Myron, Kari)
November 16, 2012 Filing 2 COMPLAINT of Plaintiff, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company against All Defendants by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company. Attorney Myron, Kari Marie added.(Myron, Kari)
November 16, 2012 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by St Paul Mercury Insurance Company (Myron, Kari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company v. Ace American Insurance Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: Alan E. Swerdlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Lamar Cope
Represented By: William Arthur Bossen
Represented By: Jennifer Corrine Kalvestran
Represented By: Dana La Rhea Leier Stenvick
Represented By: Alejandro Hugo Aharonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania General Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Elowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Skane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartis Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Nancy Jean Strout
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Morgan
Represented By: Blaise Stephen Curet
Represented By: Quyen Thi Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: Whitney Fiske O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Pacific Insurance Company
Represented By: George D Yaron
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Represented By: D. David Steele
Represented By: Jenna Eve Settino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Tamiko Alicia-Malia Dunham
Represented By: Jamie Blaire Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds of London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company
Represented By: John Feeley
Represented By: Scott P. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exact Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin A. Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory Jacob Newman
Represented By: Hee Sung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Jesse Matthew Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy M. Blaine
Represented By: Ashley Mary Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest Indemnity Company
Represented By: Linda Wendell Hsu
Represented By: Anet Medeli Castro
Represented By: Joel Andrew Morgan
Represented By: Mark Eric Inbody
Represented By: Trelawney James Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalina Holdings (Bermuda) Ltd.
Represented By: Gwen Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Wendell Hsu
Represented By: Anet Medeli Castro
Represented By: Joel Andrew Morgan
Represented By: Mark Eric Inbody
Represented By: Trelawney James Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Represented By: Quyen Thi Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Saeyoung Son
Represented By: Benjamin A. Phelps
Represented By: Andrew C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Stacy Ruth Goldscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Claims Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valiant Insurance Company
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Morgan
Represented By: Blaise Stephen Curet
Represented By: Quyen Thi Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Nancy Jean Strout
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inscorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance
Represented By: David A. Astengo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Nancy Jean Strout
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Surety Company
Represented By: John E. Peer
Represented By: Lisa Darling-Alderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurance Company of America
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Morgan
Represented By: Blaise Stephen Curet
Represented By: Quyen Thi Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley Mary Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John Feeley
Represented By: Scott P. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Paul Lindell
Represented By: Steve Blake Bitter
Represented By: Kimberly Diane Howatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Nancy Jean Strout
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John R. Campo
Represented By: Michele O. Blais
Represented By: A. Geoffrey Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Morgan
Represented By: Blaise Stephen Curet
Represented By: Quyen Thi Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Morgan
Represented By: Blaise Stephen Curet
Represented By: Quyen Thi Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Nancy Jean Strout
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Lindsey Anne Morgan
Represented By: Blaise Stephen Curet
Represented By: Quyen Thi Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott P. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph S. McMillen
Represented By: Michelle L. Carder
Represented By: David M Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley Mary Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Astengo
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Company
Represented By: George D Yaron
Represented By: Whitney Fiske O'Connor
Represented By: Gregory R. De La Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Eli
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: R. Scott LaSalle
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?