J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Maravilla
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Blanca E. Maravilla
Case Number: 2:2012cv02899
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 553 Unauthorized Reception of Cable Service
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL 56 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/29/2014. Case terminated. Case closed. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/5/13 GRANTING 42 Motion to Amend Answer. (Manzer, C)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/3/13 ORDERING that Defendant Blance Maravilla's counsel Allen R. Mitterling is allowed to appear telephonically at the hearing set for 9/9/2013 at 2:00 p.m.. The courtroom deputy shall E-mail counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kastilahn, A)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/24/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike defendant's Amended affirmative defenses 35 is GRANTED without prejudice to defendant's filing a noticed Motion for Leave to Amend. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/21/2013 re 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike : Plaintiff's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED at to defendant's first, second, third, fourth, and eight defenses and DENIED as to defendant's fifth, sixth, and seventh defenses. Defendant has fourteen days from the date of this Order to file an amended answer, if she can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on May 15, 2013 re 22 . Thomas P. Riley is hereby GRANTED permission to appear telephonically at the Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses scheduled for Monday, May 20, 2013 at 2:00 P.M. (Rivas, A)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/28/13 CONTINUING Initial Scheduling Conference to 5/28/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Joint Status Report due no later than 5/14/13. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Maravilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca E. Maravilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?