Herrera v. Gipson
Petitioner: Roberto Herrera
Respondent: Connie Gipson
Case Number: 2:2012cv02982
Filed: December 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/24/2014 RECOMMENDING that respondent's 22 motion to dismiss for failure to exhaust state court remedies or alternatively, because petitioner's claims are procedurally barred be granted; and this action be closed. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/17/2014 DENYING petitoner's 25 motion for entry of default; DENYING petitioner's 25 motion for appointment of counsel; DENYING petitioner's 25 motion for an evidentiary hearing; and GRANTING petitioner 30 days to file an opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss. (Yin, K)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/10/14 ORDERING that Petitioners motion for entry of default (Doc. No. 23 ) is DENIED; Petitioners motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. No. 23 ) is DENIED; and Petitioners motion for an evidentiary hearing (Doc. No. 23 ) is DENIED.(Dillon, M)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/21/14 ORDERING that Respondents motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 15 ) is denied as moot; Within sixty days of the date of this order, respondent shall file a new responsive pleading to petitioners application for a writ of habeas corpus. Petitioners motion for a court order (Doc. No. 19 ) is granted; and Petitioners motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. No. 19 ) is denied.(Dillon, M)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/14/13 ordering petitioner shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court shall send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roberto Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?