South Yuba River Citizens League v. National Marine Fisheries Service, et al.
Plaintiff: South Yuba River Citizens League and Friends of the River
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service, United States Department of Commerce, Rebecca M. Blank, Rodney R. McInnis, United States Army Corps of Engineers, John McHugh and William J Leady
Case Number: 2:2013cv00059
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/29/15 ORDERING that this Court determines that it would not be appropriate to award Plaintiffs the costs of litigation they incurred pursuant to 16 U.S.C. § 1504(g)(4). Consequently, P laintiffs' Motion for Dismissal and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (ECF No. 51) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted with regard to Plaintiffs' unopposed request for dismissal but denied with respect to fees and costs. This matter having been concluded in its entirety, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. (Becknal, R)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/9/2014 ORDERING the hearing on 51 Motion for Attorney Fees CONTINUED to 12/3/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Federal Defendants' response due 10/24/2014. Plaintiffs' reply due 11/19/2014. (Donati, J)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER 48 to file Motions signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/22/2014. Plaintiffs shall file Motion to Dismiss and their Motion for Attorneys' Fees & Costs by 9/19/2014. Plaintiffs will provide federal defendants with a copy of their native format Excel billing spreadsheets prior to or concurrently with filing of their Motion. Federal Defendants shall file their Opposition to plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees & Costs by 10/10/2014. Plaintiffs shall file their Reply in support of their Motion for Attorneys' Fees & Costs by 10/23/2014. The Hearing for the Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees & Costs shall be noticed for 10/30/2014. (Marciel, M)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/12/2013 ORDERING Plaintiff SYRCL's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 29 in 2:13CV0059 MCE EFB is DENIED. The federal defendants' Motion For Stay of Proceedings in 2 :13CV0059 MCE EFB is GRANTED. The federal defendants' Motion for Voluntary Remand or Stay of Proceedings 44 in 2:13CV0042 MCE CKD is DENIED with respect to remand but GRANTED with regard to the alternatively requested stay. By 10/22/2013, the Corps shall submit to NMFS the final biological assessment required for NMFS, in turn, to complete a new biological assessment for the Project, by 5/12/2014, NMFS shall issue its final biological opinion for the Project; the stay as to both related c ases shall be automatically lifted, without further court order, upon issuance of said final biological opinion; Given the stays being ordered by this Court as set forth, the following motions are DENIED as MOOT, without prejudice to being reinitiate d if and when the stays are lifted: Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in 2:13CV0059 MCE CKD 64 ; Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in 2:13CV0042 MCE EFB 20 ; and Federal Defendants' Motion for Stay of Summary Judgment Proceedings in 2:13CV0042 MCE CKD 67 . (Reader, L)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/20/13 ORDERING examination of the above-entitled actions reveals that both actions are related within the meaning of Local Rule 123(a), E.D. Cal. (1997). The actions involve the s ame parties, are based on the same or a similar claim, and involve the same property transaction or event. Because the cases are already assigned to the same district judge, this Order is issued for informational purposes only and shall have no effect on the status of the cases. (Becknal, R)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/6/13 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 20 set for 6/13/13, at 2:00 p.m. is rescheduled to 6/27/13 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7. In light of this ruling, the hearing on the parties' Joint Motion to Reschedule Hearing 24 currently set for 7/11/13, is hereby vacated. (Becknal, R)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 5/23/13 ORDERING that the deadline for Federal Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is extended to 6/4/2013, and the deadline for Plaintiffs' Reply is extended until 6/11/2013. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion shall remain as scheduled on 6/13/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/9/2013 ORDERING that the 17 Joint Motion to Amend the Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are directed to file their Second Amended Complaint not later than five (5) days following the date this Order is electronically filed. The 15 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline for Federal Defendants' Responsive Pleading is GRANTED. Federal Defendants are directed to file their responsive pleading within sixty (60) days from the filing of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. The hearing on the parties' Motions, currently set for 4/18/2013, is hereby VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/7/2013 ORDERING that the Court DECLINES to relate cases 2:06-cv-2845LKK-JFM, 2:13-cv-00059 MCE-EFB, and 2:13-cv-00042-MCE-CKD. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Yuba River Citizens League v. National Marine Fisheries Service, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca M. Blank
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney R. McInnis
Represented By: Bradley H. Oliphant
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Leady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Yuba River Citizens League
Represented By: Brian Orion
Represented By: Christopher Alan Sproul
Represented By: Patricia Lynn Weisselberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the River
Represented By: Christopher Alan Sproul
Represented By: Patricia Lynn Weisselberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?